Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/04/2021 at 01:59:22 (UTC).

CHRISTMAS, AHNAISE VS JEFFERS, AKIMBI

Case Summary

On 04/09/2021 CHRISTMAS, AHNAISE filed a Family - Harassment lawsuit against JEFFERS, AKIMBI. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Torrance Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is VEASEY, GLENDA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0208

  • Filing Date:

    04/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Harassment

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Torrance Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

VEASEY, GLENDA

 

Party Details

Petitioner

CHRISTMAS AHNAISE

Respondent

JEFFERS AKIMBI

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

4/26/2021: Minute Order

Request to Continue and Reissue TRO (Form 115)

4/26/2021: Request to Continue and Reissue TRO (Form 115)

Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116) - Hrg 05/12/21 Dept J 8:30am

4/26/2021: Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116) - Hrg 05/12/21 Dept J 8:30am

Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109)

4/9/2021: Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109)

Fee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003

4/9/2021: Fee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003

Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110) - - GRANTED

4/9/2021: Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110) - - GRANTED

Petition - Civil Harassment

4/9/2021: Petition - Civil Harassment

Declaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given)

4/9/2021: Declaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given)

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/9/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/12/2021
  • Hearing05/12/2021 at 8:30 AM in Department J at 825 Maple Ave., Torrance, CA 90503; Restraining Order Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2021
  • DocketLACourtConnect-Fees Paid V; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2021
  • DocketLACourtConnect-Fees Paid V; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department J, Veasey, Glenda, Presiding; Restraining Order Hearing - Held - Continued, TRO Reissued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • DocketNotice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • DocketNotice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116) (Hrg 05/12/21 Dept J 8:30am ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • DocketRequest to Continue and Reissue TRO (Form 115); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2021
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2021
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketFee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketFee Waiver - Request - Waive Court Fees - Filed FW001; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order (Form 110) (- GRANTED ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketNotice - Court Hearing (Form 109); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketPetition - Civil Harassment; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less