This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/02/2019 at 00:41:38 (UTC).

CHRISTLE BRYANT ET AL VS COUNTRY VILLA SOUTH CONVALESCENT CE

Case Summary

On 03/13/2018 CHRISTLE BRYANT filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against COUNTRY VILLA SOUTH CONVALESCENT CE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7895

  • Filing Date:

    03/13/2018

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioners and Plaintiffs

BRYANT CHRISTLE

REED SHARON

Respondents and Defendants

REED SHAWN NOMINAL DEFENDANT

REED SHERI NOMINAL DEFENDANT

DOES 1 THROUGH 100

REED MICHAEL NOMINAL DEFENDANT

REED KIM NOMINAL DEFENDANT

REED SHERIDAN JR. NOMINAL DEFENDANT

COUNTRY VILLA SOUTH CONVALESCENT CENTER

COUNTRY VILLA SERVICE CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorneys

MCNULTY PETER J. ESQ.

MAGAZINE JORDAN ROSS ESQ.

Respondent and Defendant Attorney

WILSON WILLIAM C.

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES: (1) WRONGFUL DEATH ;ETC

3/13/2018: COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES: (1) WRONGFUL DEATH ;ETC

SUMMONS

3/13/2018: SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

3/23/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT

6/1/2018: NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT

NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT

6/1/2018: NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT

NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT

6/1/2018: NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT

NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT

6/1/2018: NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT

NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT

6/1/2018: NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT

Request for Dismissal

4/8/2019: Request for Dismissal

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

2/13/2019: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/08/2019
  • Request for Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by Christle Bryant (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2018
  • Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by Christle Bryant (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2018
  • Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by Christle Bryant (Plaintiff); Sharon Reed (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2018
  • Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by Christle Bryant (Plaintiff); Sharon Reed (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2018
  • Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by Christle Bryant (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2018
  • NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2018
  • Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by Christle Bryant (Plaintiff); Sharon Reed (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2018
  • NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2018
  • NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2018
  • NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2018
  • NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2018
  • Answer; Filed by Country Villa South Convalescent Center (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2018
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2018
  • Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Christle Bryant (Plaintiff); Sharon Reed (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2018
  • COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES: (1) WRONGFUL DEATH ;ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2018
  • Complaint; Filed by Christle Bryant (Plaintiff); Sharon Reed (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2018
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where COUNTRY VILLA SOUTH COVALESCENT is a litigant

Latest cases where COUNTRY VILLA SERVICE CORP. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MAGAZINE JORDAN ROSS

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MCNULTY PETER JOHN