This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/06/2021 at 07:10:40 (UTC).

CHRISTINE SERVIN VS CARLOS IVAN GARCIA, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 09/09/2019 CHRISTINE SERVIN filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against CARLOS IVAN GARCIA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WENDY CHANG. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0667

  • Filing Date:

    09/09/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Courthouse:

    Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

WENDY CHANG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SERVIN CHRISTINE

Defendants

GARCIA CARLOS IVAN

SOLIS DOMINGO GARCIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

HANFF ROBERT ATLEE

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

1/4/2021: Request for Dismissal

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

9/10/2020: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

9/28/2020: [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

Answer

10/10/2019: Answer

Proof of Personal Service

9/20/2019: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

9/20/2019: Proof of Personal Service

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

9/9/2019: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/9/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

9/9/2019: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

9/9/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/14/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department A15, Wendy Chang, Presiding; Non-Jury Trial - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department A15, Wendy Chang, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Christine Servin (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department A15, Wendy Chang, Presiding; Non-Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department A15, Wendy Chang, Presiding; Non-Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department A15, Wendy Chang, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department A15, Wendy Chang, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • Docket[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, Fsc (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Personal Injury Courts Only (North District); Filed by Carlos Ivan Garcia (Defendant); Domingo Garcia Solis (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Carlos Ivan Garcia (Defendant); Domingo Garcia Solis (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Carlos Ivan Garcia (Defendant); Domingo Garcia Solis (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Christine Servin (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Christine Servin (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Christine Servin (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Christine Servin (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer HANFF ROBERT ATLEE