This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/21/2019 at 07:47:08 (UTC).

CHRISTINE LEE VS WEST COAST DENTAL SERVICE INC ET AL

Case Summary

On 02/23/2018 CHRISTINE LEE filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against WEST COAST DENTAL SERVICE INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5216

  • Filing Date:

    02/23/2018

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

LEE CHRISTINE

Defendants, Respondents and Cross Defendants

GALOIS GROUP LLC

VALENCIA GATEWAY RETAIL IV LLC

CANYON DENTAL GROUP

DOES 1 TO 10

WEST COAST DENTAL SERVICE INC

Respondent, Defendant and Cross Plaintiff

VALENCIA GATEWAY RETAIL IV LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

IKONTE CHIJOKE O. ESQ.

IKONTE CHIJIOKE OBINNAYA ESQ.

Cross Plaintiff Attorney

LEE KAREN DENISE

 

Court Documents

DEFENDANT VALENCIA GATEWAY RETAIL IV, LLC'S CROSS-COMPLAINT FOR: 1. IMPLIED INDEMNITY 2. CONTRIBUTION AND INDEMNITY 3. EXPRESS INDEMNITY 4. BREACH OF CONTRACT 5. DECLARATORY RELIEF

9/14/2018: DEFENDANT VALENCIA GATEWAY RETAIL IV, LLC'S CROSS-COMPLAINT FOR: 1. IMPLIED INDEMNITY 2. CONTRIBUTION AND INDEMNITY 3. EXPRESS INDEMNITY 4. BREACH OF CONTRACT 5. DECLARATORY RELIEF

DEFENDANT VALENCIA GATEWAY RETAIL IV, LLC'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF CHRISTINNE LEE'S COMPLAINT

9/14/2018: DEFENDANT VALENCIA GATEWAY RETAIL IV, LLC'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF CHRISTINNE LEE'S COMPLAINT

DEFENDANT VALENCIA GATEWAY RETAIL IV, LLC'S CROSS-COMPLAINT

9/14/2018: DEFENDANT VALENCIA GATEWAY RETAIL IV, LLC'S CROSS-COMPLAINT

Proof of Personal Service

10/24/2018: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

10/24/2018: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Substitution of Attorney

11/15/2018: Substitution of Attorney

Request for Dismissal

12/18/2018: Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal

4/4/2019: Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal

4/4/2019: Request for Dismissal

COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

2/23/2018: COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

Unknown

2/23/2018: Unknown

SUMMONS

2/23/2018: SUMMONS

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/04/2019
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by Christine Lee (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by Valencia Gateway Retail IV, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2018
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by Christine Lee (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2018
  • Substitution of Attorney; Filed by Karen Denise Lee (Attorney)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • Cross-Complaint; Filed by Valencia Gateway Retail IV, LLC (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2018
  • Proof of Personal Service; Filed by West Coast Dental Service, Inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2018
  • Proof Of Service Of Summons; Filed by West Coast Dental Service, Inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2018
  • DEFENDANT VALENCIA GATEWAY RETAIL IV, LLC'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF CHRISTINNE LEE'S COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2018
  • DEFENDANT VALENCIA GATEWAY RETAIL IV, LLC'S CROSS-COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2018
  • DEFENDANT VALENCIA GATEWAY RETAIL IV, LLC'S CROSS-COMPLAINT FOR: 1. IMPLIED INDEMNITY 2. CONTRIBUTION AND INDEMNITY 3. EXPRESS INDEMNITY 4. BREACH OF CONTRACT 5. DECLARATORY RELIEF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2018
  • Cross-Complaint; Filed by Valencia Gateway Retail IV, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2018
  • Summons Issued; Filed by Valencia Gateway Retail IV, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2018
  • Answer; Filed by Valencia Gateway Retail IV, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2018
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2018
  • Request-Waive Court Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2018
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2018
  • COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2018
  • Complaint; Filed by Christine Lee (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2018
  • Request to Waive Court Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where VALENCIA GATEWAY RETAIL IV LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where GALOIS GROUP LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where WEST COAST DENTAL SERVICES INC. AKA MAGICLAND CHILDREN'S DENTAL OF TORRANCE is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer IKONTE CHIJIOKE OBINNAYA