This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/08/2021 at 05:39:35 (UTC).

CHRISTINE HARBSTER, ET AL. VS 1201 NORTH CRESCENT HEIGHTS, LLC, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 06/19/2020 CHRISTINE HARBSTER filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against 1201 NORTH CRESCENT HEIGHTS, LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is GREGORY KEOSIAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3413

  • Filing Date:

    06/19/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

GREGORY KEOSIAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CARMONA ISABEL

CINCIPRINNI TONY

STOHMANN ROSEMARIE

HARBSTER CHRISTINE

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

WILSHIRE SKYLINE INC.

BNB ASSET MANAGEMENT

1201 NORTH CRESCENT HEIGHTS EXCHANGE LLC

1201 CRESCENT PROPERTIES LLC

1201 NORTH CRESCENT HEIGHTS LLC

Cross Defendant

ROES 1 THROUGH 50 INCLUSIVE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

NOVAK SEAN M

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

YEE STEVEN R

KAPLAN JEFFREY S

LEVINE STEPHEN MARC

 

Court Documents

Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF CHRISTINE HARBSTER TO PROVIDE FURTHER RESPONSES TO DEFENDANT'S FORM INTERROGATORIES, SET ONE; MOTION FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS AGAINST PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIF

7/20/2021: Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF CHRISTINE HARBSTER TO PROVIDE FURTHER RESPONSES TO DEFENDANT'S FORM INTERROGATORIES, SET ONE; MOTION FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS AGAINST PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIF

Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF TONY CINCIPRINNI TO PROVIDE FURTHER RESPONSES TO DEFENDANT'S FORM INTERROGATORIES, SET ONE; MOTON FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS AGAINST PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S

7/20/2021: Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF TONY CINCIPRINNI TO PROVIDE FURTHER RESPONSES TO DEFENDANT'S FORM INTERROGATORIES, SET ONE; MOTON FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS AGAINST PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S

Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT 1201 CRESENT PROPERTIES, LLC'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF ISABEL CARMONA TO PROVIDE FURTHER RESPONSES TO DEFENDANT'S FORM INTERROGATO

7/20/2021: Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT 1201 CRESENT PROPERTIES, LLC'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF ISABEL CARMONA TO PROVIDE FURTHER RESPONSES TO DEFENDANT'S FORM INTERROGATO

Notice of Ruling

6/2/2021: Notice of Ruling

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

6/2/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Notice - NOTICE OF RULING

4/26/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF RULING

Answer

5/3/2021: Answer

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL...)

3/25/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL...)

Notice - NOTICE OF RULING

3/25/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF RULING

Unknown - AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT (1ST)

1/8/2021: Unknown - AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT (1ST)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR THE PARTIES FAILURE TO ...)

1/25/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR THE PARTIES FAILURE TO ...)

Answer

1/4/2021: Answer

Case Management Statement

1/11/2021: Case Management Statement

Cross-Complaint

12/21/2020: Cross-Complaint

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

8/7/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

8/7/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

6/24/2020: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

6/19/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

35 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/07/2023
  • Hearing03/07/2023 at 09:00 AM in Department 61 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • Hearing02/27/2023 at 09:00 AM in Department 61 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • Hearing01/04/2023 at 09:00 AM in Department 61 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Post-Mediation Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • Hearing09/13/2021 at 10:00 AM in Department 61 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • Hearing09/13/2021 at 10:00 AM in Department 61 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • Hearing09/13/2021 at 10:00 AM in Department 61 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • Hearing09/13/2021 at 10:00 AM in Department 61 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • DocketSeparate Statement; Filed by 1201 North Crescent Heights, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • DocketMotion to Compel (DEFENDANT 1201 CRESENT PROPERTIES, LLC'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF ISABEL CARMONA TO PROVIDE FURTHER RESPONSES TO DEFENDANT'S FORM INTERROGATORIES, SET ONE; MOTION FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS AGAINST PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL); Filed by 1201 North Crescent Heights, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • DocketSeparate Statement; Filed by 1201 North Crescent Heights, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
44 More Docket Entries
  • 08/07/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Christine Harbster (Plaintiff); Isabel Carmona (Plaintiff); Tony Cinciprinni (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Christine Harbster (Plaintiff); Isabel Carmona (Plaintiff); Tony Cinciprinni (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Christine Harbster (Plaintiff); Isabel Carmona (Plaintiff); Tony Cinciprinni (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Christine Harbster (Plaintiff); Isabel Carmona (Plaintiff); Tony Cinciprinni (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Christine Harbster (Plaintiff); Isabel Carmona (Plaintiff); Tony Cinciprinni (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Christine Harbster (Plaintiff); Isabel Carmona (Plaintiff); Tony Cinciprinni (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Christine Harbster (Plaintiff); Isabel Carmona (Plaintiff); Tony Cinciprinni (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BNB ASSET MANAGEMENT is a litigant

Latest cases where WILSHIRE SKYLINE INC. is a litigant