This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/05/2019 at 08:44:08 (UTC).

CHRISTINE FRAZIER PRINCE VS BRADLEY PETER BRYANT

Case Summary

On 10/04/2017 CHRISTINE FRAZIER PRINCE filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against BRADLEY PETER BRYANT. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is LAURA A. SEIGLE. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8405

  • Filing Date:

    10/04/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

LAURA A. SEIGLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

PRINCE CHRISTINE FRAZIER

Defendants and Respondents

BRYANT BRADLEY PETER

DOES 1 TO 25

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

BYBERG GREGORY B. ESQ.

BYBERG GREGORY BOWEN ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

3/20/2019: Minute Order

Order - Dismissal

4/4/2019: Order - Dismissal

Minute Order

4/4/2019: Minute Order

Unknown

4/4/2019: Unknown

SUMMONS

10/4/2017: SUMMONS

COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

10/4/2017: COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/04/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 4B, Laura A. Seigle, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • Order - Dismissal; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Jury Trial) of 04/04/2019); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Jury Trial)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • at 10:00 AM in Department 4B, Laura A. Seigle, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by CHRISTINE FRAZIER PRINCE (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC678405    Hearing Date: November 08, 2019    Dept: 4B

[TENTATIVE] ORDER RE: MOTION TO SET ASIDE DISMISSAL

On October 4, 2017, plaintiff Christina Frazier Prince (“Plaintiff”) filed this action against defendant Bradley Peter Bryant (“Defendant”) for injuries and damages relating to an automobile accident on October 12, 2015. Plaintiff’s counsel, Gregory Byberg, claims he failed to calendar the final status conference date and trial date and failed to appear. The Court dismissed the case on April 4, 2019. Plaintiff filed this motion on October 2, 2019.

“The court may, upon any terms as may be just, relieve a party or his or her legal representative from a judgment, dismissal, order, or other proceeding taken against him or her through his or her mistake, inadvertence, surprise, or excusable neglect.” (Code Civ. Proc., § 473, subd. (b).) Application for this relief shall be made within a reasonable time, in no case exceeding six months, after judgment, dismissal, order, or proceeding was taken. (Ibid.) “[T]he court shall, whenever an application for relief is made no more than six months after entry of judgment, is in proper form, and is accompanied by an attorney’s sworn affidavit attesting to his or her mistake, inadvertence, surprise, or neglect, vacate any (1) resulting default entered by the clerk against his or her client, and which will result in entry of a default judgment, or (2) resulting default judgment or dismissal entered against his or her client, unless the court finds that the default or dismissal was not in fact caused by the attorney’s mistake, inadvertence, surprise, or neglect.” (Ibid.)

This Motion to set aside dismissal was timely filed within six months of dismissal and the Court finds dismissal was due to counsel’s excusable neglect. The Motion to set aside the April 4, 2019 dismissal is GRANTED and the action is reinstated. Trial is set for June 25, 2020 in Department 4B and the final status conference is set for June 11, 2020 in Department 4B.

Moving party to give notice.

Parties who intend to submit on this tentative must send an email to the Court at SSCDEPT4B@lacourt.org indicating intention to submit on the tentative as directed by the instructions provided on the court website at www.lacourt.org.