This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/12/2019 at 16:55:14 (UTC).

CHRISTINE BRADLEY ET AL VS MURRAY ALBERT J TRUST ET AL

Case Summary

On 06/16/2017 CHRISTINE BRADLEY filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against MURRAY ALBERT J TRUST. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JOHN P. DOYLE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5429

  • Filing Date:

    06/16/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JOHN P. DOYLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

JOHNSON SHOSHANA

BRADLEY CHRISTINE

JOHNSON DANYETTA

Defendants and Respondents

ROBERTSON TASHAWNE

MURRAY ALBERT J TRUST

DOES 1 TO 100

DORIAN MURRAY AS TRUSTEE OF THE REVOCABLE

DORIAN MURRAY TRUSTEE OF THE ALBERT J. MURRAY TRUST

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

NIELSEN JONATHAN L. ESQ.

NIELSEN JONATHAN LOWRY ESQ.

Defendant Attorney

FOX FRANK OLIVER

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

3/28/2018: Minute Order

NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER OF DEFENDANT, DORIAN MURRAY

5/29/2018: NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER OF DEFENDANT, DORIAN MURRAY

Minute Order

5/30/2018: Minute Order

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE

6/4/2018: NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM ADDRESS

6/11/2018: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM ADDRESS

PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF OPPOSITION AND OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT DORIAN MURRAY'S DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT AND ETC

6/28/2018: PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF OPPOSITION AND OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT DORIAN MURRAY'S DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT AND ETC

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE

7/9/2018: REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE

REPLY RE DEMURRER

7/9/2018: REPLY RE DEMURRER

Minute Order

7/16/2018: Minute Order

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

7/24/2018: ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

9/12/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

Unknown

10/1/2018: Unknown

Minute Order

10/18/2018: Minute Order

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

2/5/2019: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Minute Order

2/6/2019: Minute Order

Minute Order

3/14/2019: Minute Order

Notice of Ruling

3/15/2019: Notice of Ruling

Unknown

4/4/2019: Unknown

27 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/29/2019
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 58; Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 58; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 58; Hearing on Motion to Continue Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 58; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 58; Order to Show Cause Re: (Reclassification) - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 58; Order to Show Cause Re: (Deposition Completion) - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 58; Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 58; Conference (ReMSC Setting) - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 58; Status Conference - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 58; Order to Show Cause Re: (Reclassification) - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
66 More Docket Entries
  • 09/15/2017
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 58; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service (OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Matter continued) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2017
  • DocketMinute order entered: 2017-09-15 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2017
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2017
  • DocketOSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2017
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2017
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2017
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES 1. BREACH OF CONTRACT; ETC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Christine Bradley (Plaintiff); Danyetta Johnson (Plaintiff); Shoshana Johnson (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: ****5429    Hearing Date: December 30, 2019    Dept: 58

Judge John P. Doyle

Department 58


Hearing Date: December 30, 2019

Case Name: Bradley, et al. v. Murray Albert J Trust, et al.

Case No.: ****5429 & 19STCV01218 (related cases)

Motion: Default Judgment Application

Tentative Ruling: The Default Judgment Application is denied.


The Default Judgment Application is denied for the following reasons.

(1) ****5429 and 19STCV01218 are separate, related actions, and, yet, one judgment was improperly submitted as to both actions.

(2) Default has not apparently been entered against Defendant Robertson in 19STCV01218.

(3) The Court will not award punitive damages because evidence of Defendant’s financial condition has not been provided. (Adams v. Murakami (1991) 54 Cal.3d 105, 110.)

(4) No request for dismissal was filed as to the Doe Defendants.

(5) The wrong case number is written on most documents in the Default Judgment Application.



related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer FOX FRANK OLIVER