This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/01/2022 at 20:13:47 (UTC).

CHRISTINE ARMENDARIZ VS SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA SPECIALTY CARE, LLC

Case Summary

On 07/02/2021 CHRISTINE ARMENDARIZ filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA SPECIALTY CARE, LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is YVETTE M. PALAZUELOS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4479

  • Filing Date:

    07/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

YVETTE M. PALAZUELOS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ARMENDARIZ CHRISTINE

Defendants

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA SPECIALTY CARE LLC DBA KINDRED HEALTHCARE OPERATING LLC A DELAWARE CORPORATION

KINDRED HEALTHCARE OPERATING LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HAWKINS JAMES R.

Defendant Attorney

ATHANASIOUS MAGGY MOKHLES

 

Court Documents

Declaration - DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

4/8/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

Request - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF CLASS ACTION CLAIMS PURSUANT TO CRC 3.770 WITHOUT PREJUDICE

4/8/2022: Request - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF CLASS ACTION CLAIMS PURSUANT TO CRC 3.770 WITHOUT PREJUDICE

Order - [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

4/12/2022: Order - [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

Notice of Rejection Of Electronic Filing

2/15/2022: Notice of Rejection Of Electronic Filing

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: FILING OF RESPONSIVE PLEADING ...)

2/22/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: FILING OF RESPONSIVE PLEADING ...)

Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service

2/22/2022: Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service

Answer - ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF UNVERIFIED FIRST AMENDED CLASS ACTION & PAGA COMPLAINT

2/4/2022: Answer - ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF UNVERIFIED FIRST AMENDED CLASS ACTION & PAGA COMPLAINT

Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

1/6/2022: Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: FILING OF STIPULATION AND [PRO...)

1/3/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: FILING OF STIPULATION AND [PRO...)

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER PERMITTING LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

1/3/2022: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER PERMITTING LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: FILING OF STIPULATION AND [PRO...) OF 01/03/2022

1/3/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: FILING OF STIPULATION AND [PRO...) OF 01/03/2022

Notice - NOTICE OF OCTOBER 18, 2021 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER, MINUTE ORDER, AND ORDER AUTHORIZING ELECTRONIC SERVICE

11/29/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF OCTOBER 18, 2021 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER, MINUTE ORDER, AND ORDER AUTHORIZING ELECTRONIC SERVICE

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: FILING RESPONSIVE PLEADING;)

12/2/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: FILING RESPONSIVE PLEADING;)

Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service

12/2/2021: Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION TO CONTINUE DEADLINE FOR DEFENDANT SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA SPECIALTY CARE, LLC TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT; [PROPOSED] ORDER

12/3/2021: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION TO CONTINUE DEADLINE FOR DEFENDANT SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA SPECIALTY CARE, LLC TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT; [PROPOSED] ORDER

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

10/18/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

Case Management Order

10/18/2021: Case Management Order

Order - ORDER AUTHORIZING ELECTRONIC SERVICE

10/18/2021: Order - ORDER AUTHORIZING ELECTRONIC SERVICE

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/25/2022
  • Hearing10/25/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 9 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Appearance Case Review

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • DocketOrder Granting Request for Dismissal; Filed by Christine Armendariz (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • DocketDeclaration in Support of Request for Dismissal; Filed by Christine Armendariz (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • DocketRequest (For Dismissal of Class Action Claims Pursuant to CRC 3.770 without Prejudice); Filed by Christine Armendariz (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 9, Yvette M. Palazuelos, Presiding; Non-Appearance Case Review (ReFiling of Responsive Pleading to First Amended Complaint) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • DocketClerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Filing of Responsive Pleading ...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • DocketNotice of Rejection of Electronic Filing; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • DocketAnswer (To Plaintiff Unverified First Amended Class Action & Paga Complaint); Filed by Southern California Specialty Care, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 9, Yvette M. Palazuelos, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (Entry of Default as to Non-Answering Defendants or Responsive Pleading) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
19 More Docket Entries
  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketOrder (Re: Plaintiff's Request for Continuance of Initial Status Conference); Filed by Christine Armendariz (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • DocketRequest (for Continuance of Initial Status Conference); Filed by Christine Armendariz (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • Docketat 10:37 AM in Department 9, Yvette M. Palazuelos, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order re: Complex Designation)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re: Complex Designation) of 07/15/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketInitial Status Conference Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Christine Armendariz (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Christine Armendariz (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SOUTHERN CALFIORNIA SPECIALTY CARE INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where KINDRED HEALTHCARE OPERATING INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ATHANASIOUS MAGGY