Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/04/2021 at 10:43:29 (UTC).

CHRISTINA T PEREZ VS PI KAPPA ALPHA, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 03/19/2021 CHRISTINA T PEREZ filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against PI KAPPA ALPHA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0834

  • Filing Date:

    03/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PEREZ CHRISTINA T

Defendants

B&B MANAGEMENT SERVICES INC.

FRATERNITY & SORORITY SERVICES INC.

CALIFORNIA GAMMA CHAPTER HOUSE ASSOCIATION OF PHI DELTA THETA

PI KAPPA ALPHA

WEST RANGE CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CHANG GRACE LEA

 

Court Documents

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

6/2/2021: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

3/30/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

PI General Order

3/30/2021: PI General Order

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

3/19/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/19/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

3/19/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

3/19/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/15/2024
  • Hearing03/15/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • Hearing09/16/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2022
  • Hearing09/02/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by Christina T Perez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Christina T Perez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Christina T Perez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Christina T Perez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where B&B MANAGEMENT SERVICES INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CHANG GRACE LEA