This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/24/2022 at 15:33:15 (UTC).

CHRISTINA RAY VS UBER TECHNOLOGIES, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/23/2022 CHRISTINA RAY filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against UBER TECHNOLOGIES, INC ,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7060

  • Filing Date:

    11/23/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RAY CHRISTINA

Defendants

GODINEZ HAUNTES GREGORIO

RASIER LLC

RASIER-CA LLC

SALVADOR ORTIZ TERESA

UBER TECHNOLOGIES INC.

UBER USA LLC

YEN SCARLETT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GEOULLA DANIEL DANNY

 

Court Documents

Complaint

11/23/2022: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/23/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/23/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

11/23/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Unknown - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL PERSONAL INJURY CASE

11/23/2022: Unknown - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL PERSONAL INJURY CASE

Unknown - EIGHTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR PROCEDURES IN THE PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURTS

11/23/2022: Unknown - EIGHTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR PROCEDURES IN THE PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURTS

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

11/23/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

11/23/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/20/2024
  • Hearing11/20/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2024
  • Hearing05/22/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2024
  • Hearing05/08/2024 at 10:00 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Christina Ray (Plaintiff); As to: Uber Technologies, Inc. (Defendant); Uber USA, LLC (Defendant); Rasier, LLC (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/22/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 11/20/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Christina Ray (Plaintiff); As to: Uber Technologies, Inc. (Defendant); Uber USA, LLC (Defendant); Rasier, LLC (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Christina Ray (Plaintiff); As to: Uber Technologies, Inc. (Defendant); Uber USA, LLC (Defendant); Rasier, LLC (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Christina Ray (Plaintiff); As to: Uber Technologies, Inc. (Defendant); Uber USA, LLC (Defendant); Rasier, LLC (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • DocketEighth Amended Standing Order for Procedures in the Personal Injury Hub Courts; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Personal Injury Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 05/08/2024 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. William A. Crowfoot in Department 27 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Rasier-CA LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where UBER USA LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where RASIER LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where UBER TECHNOLOGIES INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION is a litigant