Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/07/2021 at 08:10:41 (UTC).

CHRISTINA NEIWIRTH, ET AL. VS ANNIE MAE ISHMAEL, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 07/15/2020 CHRISTINA NEIWIRTH filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against ANNIE MAE ISHMAEL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is BARBARA A. MEIERS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6634

  • Filing Date:

    07/15/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

BARBARA A. MEIERS

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

NEIWIRTH CHRISTINA

NEIWIRTH ROBERT

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

ISHMAEL ANNIE MAE

DAY FOBBS JOYCE

RICHARDS GAIL

WESTCHESTER PLAYA REALTY ALLIANCE INC. DBA PACIFIC PLAYA REALTY

NWABUZOR OBIAMAKA

DAVIS NATHANIEL AKA NATHANIEL ISHMAEL

Defendants and Cross Defendants

RICHARDS GAIL

WESTCHESTER PLAYA REALTY ALLIANCE INC. DBA PACIFIC PLAYA REALTY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GORDON PETER D.

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

SZABO LAWRENCE J.

BARTSCH DUANE

Defendant and Cross Defendant Attorney

BARTSCH DUANE

 

Court Documents

Notice - NOTICE OF CHANGE OF HEARING TIME

4/28/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF CHANGE OF HEARING TIME

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

4/28/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Proof of Personal Service

3/5/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

3/8/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Proof of Personal Service

2/2/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

1/19/2021: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Answer

1/19/2021: Answer

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

12/21/2020: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

12/21/2020: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

12/24/2020: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

12/30/2020: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Declaration and Order re: Advance Jury Fees

12/31/2020: Declaration and Order re: Advance Jury Fees

Case Management Statement

12/31/2020: Case Management Statement

Answer

1/5/2021: Answer

Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

9/8/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Proof of Personal Service

7/22/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

8/4/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

7/15/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

34 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/04/2022
  • Hearing04/04/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 12 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • Hearing03/23/2022 at 09:30 AM in Department 12 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • Hearing06/10/2021 at 09:00 AM in Department 12 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • Docketat 2:00 PM in Department 12, Barbara A. Meiers, Presiding; Ruling on Submitted Matter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Ruling on Submitted Matter) of 06/02/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 12, Barbara A. Meiers, Presiding; Trial Setting Conference - Held - Taken under Submission

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • Docketat 11:30 AM in Department 12, Barbara A. Meiers, Presiding; Non-Jury Trial - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 12, Barbara A. Meiers, Presiding; Non-Jury Trial - Not Held - Rescheduled by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
36 More Docket Entries
  • 08/04/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • DocketDeclaration re: Due Diligence; Filed by Christina Neiwirth (Plaintiff); Robert Neiwirth (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Christina Neiwirth (Plaintiff); Robert Neiwirth (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by Christina Neiwirth (Plaintiff); Robert Neiwirth (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by Christina Neiwirth (Plaintiff); Robert Neiwirth (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by Christina Neiwirth (Plaintiff); Robert Neiwirth (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Christina Neiwirth (Plaintiff); Robert Neiwirth (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Christina Neiwirth (Plaintiff); Robert Neiwirth (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Christina Neiwirth (Plaintiff); Robert Neiwirth (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less