Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/15/2019 at 09:01:22 (UTC).

CHRISTIAN VILLEGAS VS FOREMAN FINANCIAL INC ET AL

Case Summary

On 02/07/2017 CHRISTIAN VILLEGAS filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against FOREMAN FINANCIAL INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are BARBARA A. MEIERS and ELIZABETH ALLEN WHITE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9676

  • Filing Date:

    02/07/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

BARBARA A. MEIERS

ELIZABETH ALLEN WHITE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

VILLEGAS CHRISTIAN

Defendants and Respondents

FOREMAN FINANCIAL INC

DOES 1 TO 20

FUENTES ADELINA

FOREMAN FINANCIAL INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

ELIHU KAVEH S. ESQ.

Defendant Attorneys

LEVENTHAL JONATHAN D.

LEVINSON ROBERT A. ESQ.

WISEMAN BRETT K.

 

Court Documents

Substitution of Attorney

6/26/2019: Substitution of Attorney

Substitution of Attorney

6/26/2019: Substitution of Attorney

Minute Order

1/16/2018: Minute Order

Minute Order

1/16/2019: Minute Order

SUMMONS

2/7/2017: SUMMONS

Minute Order

2/14/2017: Minute Order

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

2/22/2017: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

3/24/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

3/24/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

DECLARATION OF DUE DILIGENCE

3/24/2017: DECLARATION OF DUE DILIGENCE

Minute Order

5/8/2017: Minute Order

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDERS CONTINUING HEARING DATE OF DEFENDANTS' PETITION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION FOR CONCURRENT HEARING WITH CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE, AND DIRECTING DEFENDANTS' COUNSEL TO GIVE NOTICE

5/12/2017: NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDERS CONTINUING HEARING DATE OF DEFENDANTS' PETITION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION FOR CONCURRENT HEARING WITH CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE, AND DIRECTING DEFENDANTS' COUNSEL TO GIVE NOTICE

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

5/16/2017: SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

PROOF OF SERVICE OF NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANTS

6/21/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE OF NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANTS

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

6/30/2017: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

PLAINTIFF CHRISTIAN VILLEGAS' OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND STAY FURTHER PROCEEDINGS; ETC

7/3/2017: PLAINTIFF CHRISTIAN VILLEGAS' OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND STAY FURTHER PROCEEDINGS; ETC

Minute Order

7/17/2017: Minute Order

ORDER APPOINTING COURT APPROVED REPORTER AS OFFICIAL REPORTER PRO TEMPORE

7/17/2017: ORDER APPOINTING COURT APPROVED REPORTER AS OFFICIAL REPORTER PRO TEMPORE

25 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/13/2020
  • Hearingat 08:30 AM in Department 48 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 48, Elizabeth Allen White, Presiding; Status Conference (Regarding Arbitration) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Status Conference Regarding Arbitration)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by Foreman Financial, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by Adelina Fuentes (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by Christian Villegas (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • Docketat 08:31 AM in Department 48, Elizabeth Allen White, Presiding; Status Conference (Regarding Arbitration) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ((Status Conference Regarding Arbitration)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2018
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 48; Status Conference (Status Conference; Matter continued) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2018
  • DocketMinute order entered: 2018-07-16 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
62 More Docket Entries
  • 02/22/2017
  • DocketNotice; Filed by Christian Villegas (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2017
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2017
  • Docketat 2:45 PM in Department 12; Unknown Event Type - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2017
  • DocketMinute order entered: 2017-02-14 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2017
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2017
  • DocketChallenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6); Filed by Christian Villegas (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2017
  • DocketPEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER (CODE CIV. PROC., 170.6)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR: 1. DISCRIMINATION IN VIOLATION OF GOV'T CODE 1294O ET SEQ.; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Christian Villegas (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC649676    Hearing Date: February 05, 2021    Dept: 48

[TENTATIVE] ORDER RE MOTION TO COMPEL COMPLIANCE WITH SUBPOENA

On December 9, 2020, Defendants Foreman Financial, Inc. and Adelina Fuentes and Plaintiff Christian Villegas filed a joint motion to compel compliance with a subpoena served on non-party Samaritana Medical Clinic.

California Rules of Court, rule 3.1346 states, “A written notice and all moving papers supporting a motion to compel an answer to a deposition question or to compel production of a document or tangible thing from a nonparty deponent must be personally served on the nonparty deponent unless the nonparty deponent agrees to accept service by mail or electronic service at an address or electronic service address specified on the deposition record.” The motion does not include a proof of service showing personal service, or any kind of service, of the motion to compel on Samaritana Medical Clinic.

Therefore, the motion is DENIED.

Moving party to give notice.

Parties who intend to submit on this tentative must send an email to the Court at SMCDEPT48@lacourt.org indicating intention to submit. Parties intending to appear are STRONGLY encouraged to appear remotely.

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FOREMAN FINANCIAL INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WISEMAN BRETT KYLE

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LEVENTHAL JONATHAN DAVID

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LEVINSON ROBERT