This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/02/2023 at 04:03:36 (UTC).

CHRISTIAN THOMAS VANTUIN VS SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 08/27/2021 CHRISTIAN THOMAS VANTUIN filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DAVID S. CUNNINGHAM III. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1834

  • Filing Date:

    08/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

DAVID S. CUNNINGHAM III

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

VANTUIN CHRISTIAN THOMAS

Defendants

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY

EDISON INTERNATIONAL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FOX DAVID ADAM

Defendant Attorneys

DIXON ESQ DOUGLAS

HUESTON ESQ JOHN

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: WHY THE STAY ON DISCOVERY SHOULD NOT ...)

12/20/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: WHY THE STAY ON DISCOVERY SHOULD NOT ...)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: WHY THE STAY ON DISCOVERY SHOULD NOT ...)

12/14/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: WHY THE STAY ON DISCOVERY SHOULD NOT ...)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER)

12/14/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER)

Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service

12/14/2022: Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE)

12/7/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE)

12/7/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO PROSECUTE [21SMCV01768]; F...)

11/8/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO PROSECUTE [21SMCV01768]; F...)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER)

10/7/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE; HEARING ON MOTION - OTHER OF BAKLA...)

9/27/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE; HEARING ON MOTION - OTHER OF BAKLA...)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE; HEARING ON MOTION - OTHER OF BAKLA...)

9/27/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE; HEARING ON MOTION - OTHER OF BAKLA...)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE)

8/22/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE)

8/16/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL ALL ATTYS FOR STR...)

7/22/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL ALL ATTYS FOR STR...)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE; FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE; HEARING...)

7/14/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE; FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE; HEARING...)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

5/13/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

5/13/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTER)

2/16/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTER)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL BY BRIAN R. STRAN...)

1/10/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL BY BRIAN R. STRAN...)

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/12/2023
  • Hearing01/12/2023 at 2:00 PM in Department 10 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Further Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Further Status Conference scheduled for 01/17/2023 at 09:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 10 Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court was rescheduled to 01/12/2023 02:00 PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Why the Stay on Discovery Should Not ...)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • DocketClerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Nunc Pro Tunc Order)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • DocketDue to Clerical Error, Order to Show Cause Re: Why the Stay on Discovery Should Not Be Lifted scheduled for 12/20/2023 at 03:30 PM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 10 Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court was rescheduled to 12/14/2022 03:30 PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • DocketDue to Clerical Error, Order to Show Cause Re: Why the Stay on Discovery Should Not Be Lifted scheduled for 12/14/2022 at 03:30 PM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 10 Not Held - Trailed was rescheduled to 12/20/2022 03:30 PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Why the Stay on Discovery Should Not ...)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Further Status Conference)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to Prosecute [21SMCV01768]; F...)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
31 More Docket Entries
  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketThe case is removed from the special status of: Provisionally Complex ? Case Type

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketCase reassigned to Spring Street Courthouse in Department 10 - Hon. William F. Highberger; Reason: Deemed Complex (Non-Class Action)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Deemed Complex

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Stay - Deemed Complex

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketMinute Order (Court Order Re. Complex Determination;)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Christian Thomas VanTuin (Plaintiff); As to: Southern California Edison Company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Christian Thomas VanTuin (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • DocketCase assigned in Department 15 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Provisionally Complex ? Case Type

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less