This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/02/2019 at 01:13:45 (UTC).

CHRISTIAN SHELTON, ET AL VS HANLEY, GEORGE DELDRIMIER, ET AL

Case Summary

On 08/03/2017 CHRISTIAN SHELTON filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against HANLEY, GEORGE DELDRIMIER. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is BRIAN C. YEP. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7278

  • Filing Date:

    08/03/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

BRIAN C. YEP

 

Party Details

Defendants and Cross Defendants

HANLEY GEORGE DELDRIMIER

COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES

IS DEV PALMDALE LLC (DOE 1)

IS DEV PALMDALE LLC DOE 1

DELDRIMIER GEORGE

IS DEV PALMDALE LLC

MARKETPLACE LLC

A.V. MAINTENANCE CENTER LLC

HR PROPERTY GROUP

MARKETPLACE LLC DBA HR PROPERTY GROUP

MARKETPLACE LLC DBA

Defendants, Cross Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

IS DEV PALMDALE LLC

MARKETPLACE LLC

Minor

SHELTON CHRISTIAN

Guardian Ad Litem

SHETON CHANDRE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant, Cross Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

BECKS HAROLD G. ESQ.

WAIT THOMAS BRIAN

SOMES RICHARD R.

SOMES RICHARD G.

GRANT MINDI CLAUDIA

GAGNE CARLA JENNIFER

PORVIN TERRY

HAIGH AUSTIN S.

Minor Attorney

MOLCHAN JEFFREY L.

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL...)

11/25/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL...)

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

11/15/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Case Management Statement

11/19/2019: Case Management Statement

Proof of Personal Service

9/25/2019: Proof of Personal Service

Answer

9/18/2019: Answer

Case Management Statement

9/13/2019: Case Management Statement

Substitution of Attorney

9/13/2019: Substitution of Attorney

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name) - AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT (FICTITIOUS/INCORRECT NAME) DOE 4

8/29/2019: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name) - AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT (FICTITIOUS/INCORRECT NAME) DOE 4

Case Management Statement

8/30/2019: Case Management Statement

Notice - NOTICE OF HANDLING ATTORNEY CHANGE

8/16/2019: Notice - NOTICE OF HANDLING ATTORNEY CHANGE

Notice of Lodging - NOTICE OF LODGING EXHIBIT B TO DEFENDANTS' VOLUME OF EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

4/3/2019: Notice of Lodging - NOTICE OF LODGING EXHIBIT B TO DEFENDANTS' VOLUME OF EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

Order - ORDER GRANTING THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES AND GEORGE HANLEY'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

8/12/2019: Order - ORDER GRANTING THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES AND GEORGE HANLEY'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

Declaration - DECLARATION DEFENDANTS' VOLUME OF EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

4/2/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION DEFENDANTS' VOLUME OF EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO GRANT DEFENDANT, IS DEV PALMDALE, LLC LEAVE TO FILE A CROSS-COMPLAINT

4/12/2019: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO GRANT DEFENDANT, IS DEV PALMDALE, LLC LEAVE TO FILE A CROSS-COMPLAINT

Notice of Deposit - Jury

1/22/2019: Notice of Deposit - Jury

Answer

10/11/2018: Answer

SECOND AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE PI COURT PROCEDURES

10/24/2016: SECOND AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE PI COURT PROCEDURES

COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES) -

8/3/2017: COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES) -

74 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/23/2020
  • Hearing10/23/2020 at 08:30 AM in Department A14 at 42011 4th Street West, Lancaster, CA 93534; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • Hearing10/14/2020 at 08:30 AM in Department A14 at 42011 4th Street West, Lancaster, CA 93534; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • Hearing03/23/2020 at 08:30 AM in Department A14 at 42011 4th Street West, Lancaster, CA 93534; Order to Show Cause Re: Sanctions for Failure to Complete Private Mediation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • Hearing03/23/2020 at 08:30 AM in Department A14 at 42011 4th Street West, Lancaster, CA 93534; Post-Mediation Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department A14, Brian C. Yep, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department A14, Brian C. Yep, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (Stipulation to Attend Private Mediation) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department A14, Brian C. Yep, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (Dismissal of All Unserved Parties) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by A.V. Maintenance Center, LLC (Cross-Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by A.V. Maintenance Center, LLC (Cross-Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
105 More Docket Entries
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Chandre Shelton (Non-Party); Christian Shelton (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketAPPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTEMT OF GUARDIAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2017
  • DocketMiscellaneous-Other; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2017
  • DocketNOTICE OF REJECTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2017
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2017
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2017
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2016
  • DocketSECOND AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE PI COURT PROCEDURES

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.