This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/05/2023 at 06:42:38 (UTC).

CHRISTIAN MUNOZ VS WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A., A UNITED STATES NATIONAL ASSOCIATION

Case Summary

On 11/22/2021 CHRISTIAN MUNOZ filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against WELLS FARGO BANK, N A , A UNITED STATES NATIONAL ASSOCIATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is BARBARA A. MEIERS. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3083

  • Filing Date:

    11/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

BARBARA A. MEIERS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MUNOZ CHRISTIAN

Defendant

WELLS FARGO BANK N.A. A UNITED STATES NATIONAL ASSOCIATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MEZA CONTRERAS NATHALIE ESQ.

Defendant Attorney

DAMRON-HSIAO KYMBERLEIGH

 

Court Documents

Complaint

11/22/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

11/22/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/22/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

11/22/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/24/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

12/2/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

12/16/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Answer

12/27/2021: Answer

Notice - NOTICE TO ADVERSE PARTY OF REMOVAL OF CIVIL ACTION TO UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT UNDER 28 U.S.C. SECTION 1332, 1441, AND 1446 (DIVERSITY)

12/28/2021: Notice - NOTICE TO ADVERSE PARTY OF REMOVAL OF CIVIL ACTION TO UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT UNDER 28 U.S.C. SECTION 1332, 1441, AND 1446 (DIVERSITY)

Notice of Removal to Federal Court

12/28/2021: Notice of Removal to Federal Court

Case Management Statement

5/10/2022: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

5/10/2022: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

5/25/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

05/25/2022

DocketOn the Complaint filed by Christian Munoz on 11/22/2021, entered Order for Dismissal without prejudice as to the entire action

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/25/2022

DocketMinute Order (Case Management Conference)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/25/2022

DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 05/25/2022 at 09:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 12 updated: Result Date to 05/25/2022; Result Type to Held

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/10/2022

DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by: WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A., a United States National Association (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/10/2022

DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by: Christian Munoz (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/29/2022

DocketThe case is removed from the special status of: Stay - Removal to Federal Court

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/28/2021

DocketNotice of Removal to Federal Court; Filed by: WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A., a United States National Association (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/28/2021

DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Stay - Removal to Federal Court

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/28/2021

DocketNotice TO ADVERSE PARTY OF REMOVAL OF CIVIL ACTION TO UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT UNDER 28 U.S.C. SECTION 1332, 1441, AND 1446 (DIVERSITY); Filed by: WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A., a United States National Association (Defendant); As to: Christian Munoz (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/27/2021

DocketAnswer; Filed by: WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A., a United States National Association (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/16/2021

DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/16/2021

DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 05/25/2022 at 09:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 12

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/02/2021

DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Christian Munoz (Plaintiff); As to: WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A., a United States National Association (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 11/30/2021; Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: No

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/24/2021

DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Christian Munoz (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/23/2021

DocketCase assigned to Hon. Barbara A. Meiers in Department 12 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/22/2021

DocketComplaint; Filed by: Christian Munoz (Plaintiff); As to: WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A., a United States National Association (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/22/2021

DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Christian Munoz (Plaintiff); As to: WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A., a United States National Association (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/22/2021

DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Christian Munoz (Plaintiff); As to: WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A., a United States National Association (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/22/2021

DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less