This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/15/2023 at 12:32:12 (UTC).

CHRISTIAN KEPLER VS FRESENIUS MEDICAL CARE HOLDINGS, INC., A NEW YORK CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/19/2022 CHRISTIAN KEPLER filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against FRESENIUS MEDICAL CARE HOLDINGS, INC , A NEW YORK CORPORATION,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is CHARLES C. LEE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9261

  • Filing Date:

    12/19/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

CHARLES C. LEE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KEPLER CHRISTIAN

Defendant

FRESENIUS MEDICAL CARE HOLDINGS INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

WALKER KATHLEEN M.

 

Court Documents

Amended Complaint - (AMENDED)

4/19/2023: Amended Complaint - (AMENDED)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

4/18/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) OF 04/18/2023

4/18/2023: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) OF 04/18/2023

Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore

4/13/2023: Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore

Notice of Ruling

4/13/2023: Notice of Ruling

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER)

4/13/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITH MOTION TO STRIKE (CCP 430.10) TO C...)

4/13/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITH MOTION TO STRIKE (CCP 430.10) TO C...)

Response - RESPONSE TO DEMURRER & MOTION TO DISMISS

4/6/2023: Response - RESPONSE TO DEMURRER & MOTION TO DISMISS

Response - RESPONSE TO DEMURRER & MOTION TO DISMISS; RESERVATION NO.: 847661560131

4/6/2023: Response - RESPONSE TO DEMURRER & MOTION TO DISMISS; RESERVATION NO.: 847661560131

Notice - NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS DEMURRER AND MOTION TO STRIKE

4/6/2023: Notice - NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS DEMURRER AND MOTION TO STRIKE

Case Management Statement

4/3/2023: Case Management Statement

Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)

2/9/2023: Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)

Request for Judicial Notice

2/9/2023: Request for Judicial Notice

Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)

2/9/2023: Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)

Request For Copies

1/6/2023: Request For Copies

Notice of Case Management Conference

12/20/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Complaint

12/19/2022: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

12/19/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/20/2023
  • Hearing07/20/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 24 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2023
  • DocketFirst Amended Complaint; Filed by: Christian Kepler (Plaintiff); As to: Fresenius Medical Care Holdings, Inc. (Defendant); National Medical Care Inc. (Defendant); Bio-Medical Applications of California Inc. (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Case Management Conference)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2023
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Case Management Conference) of 04/18/2023; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2023
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Case Management Conference scheduled for 04/18/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 24 Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion was rescheduled to 07/20/2023 08:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Demurrer to Complaint; reservation no.: 847661560131: Filed By: Fresenius Medical Care Holdings, Inc. (Defendant); Result: Sustained with Leave to Amend ; Result Date: 04/13/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Motion to Strike portions of plaintiff's complaint; reservation no.: 847661560131: Filed By: Fresenius Medical Care Holdings, Inc. (Defendant); Result: Granted ; Result Date: 04/13/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2023
  • DocketOrder Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore; Filed by: Fresenius Medical Care Holdings, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2023
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by: Fresenius Medical Care Holdings, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Nunc Pro Tunc Order)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
23 More Docket Entries
  • 12/20/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Bio-Medical Applications of California Inc. (Defendant): Organization Name changed from Bio-Medical Applications of California Inc., a Delaware Corporation to Bio-Medical Applications of California Inc.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Christian Kepler (Plaintiff); As to: Fresenius Medical Care Holdings, Inc., a New York Corporation (Defendant); National Medical Care Inc., a Delaware Corporation (Defendant); Bio-Medical Applications of California Inc., a Delaware Corporation (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: Christian Kepler (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Christian Kepler (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Kristin S. Escalante in Department 24 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: *******9261 Hearing Date: April 13, 2023 Dept: 24

Demurrer by defendant Fresenius Medical Care Holdings, Inc., to plaintiff’s complaint. SUSTAINED IN ITS ENTIRETY on grounds set forth in the moving papers. 20 days leave to amend. Although it is far from clear plaintiff will be able to successfully amend, plaintiff will be given an opportunity to do so. Defendant’s request for judicial notice is granted.

Motion to strike portions of plaintiff’s complaint.

GRANTED IN ITS ENTIRETY on grounds set forth in the moving papers. 20 days leave to amend. Although it is far from clear plaintiff will be able to successfully amend, plaintiff will be given an opportunity to do so. Defendant’s request for judicial notice is granted.