This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/16/2022 at 09:05:29 (UTC).

CHRISTIAN GARCIA PIZANO, ET AL. VS FCA US LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Case Summary

On 06/29/2021 CHRISTIAN GARCIA PIZANO filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against FCA US LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is BARBARA A. MEIERS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4111

  • Filing Date:

    06/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

BARBARA A. MEIERS

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

GARCIA AGUEDA

GARCIA HUGO

GARCIA PIZANO CHRISTIAN

Defendants

FCA US LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

FCA US LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

MIKHOV STEVE

MORSE AMY-LYN

MORSE AMY

Defendant Attorney

FRAZIER CANDACE J.

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

9/17/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Case Management Statement

9/10/2021: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

9/13/2021: Case Management Statement

Notice of Settlement

9/16/2021: Notice of Settlement

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

8/24/2021: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Notice of Remand from Federal Court

8/13/2021: Notice of Remand from Federal Court

Notice of Case Management Conference

8/17/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Remand from Federal Court

8/13/2021: Notice of Remand from Federal Court

Answer

7/30/2021: Answer

Notice of Removal to Federal Court - NOTICE OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT NOTICE TO STATE COURT OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT

7/30/2021: Notice of Removal to Federal Court - NOTICE OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT NOTICE TO STATE COURT OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT

Notice of Removal to Federal Court - NOTICE OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT NOTICE TO ADVERSE PARTY OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT

7/30/2021: Notice of Removal to Federal Court - NOTICE OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT NOTICE TO ADVERSE PARTY OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT

Notice - NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT

8/2/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT

Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings

8/2/2021: Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER)

8/2/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER)

Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

8/2/2021: Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

8/2/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) OF 08/02/2021

8/2/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) OF 08/02/2021

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER) OF 08/02/2021

8/2/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER) OF 08/02/2021

22 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/24/2022
  • Hearing02/24/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 78 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 56; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 78; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by CHRISTIAN GARCIA PIZANO (Plaintiff); HUGO GARCIA (Plaintiff); AGUEDA GARCIA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 12, Barbara A. Meiers, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by FCA US LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by CHRISTIAN GARCIA PIZANO (Plaintiff); HUGO GARCIA (Plaintiff); AGUEDA GARCIA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 56; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketNotice (NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE); Filed by CHRISTIAN GARCIA PIZANO (Plaintiff); HUGO GARCIA (Plaintiff); AGUEDA GARCIA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
21 More Docket Entries
  • 07/02/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 07/02/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketChallenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6); Filed by CHRISTIAN GARCIA PIZANO (Plaintiff); HUGO GARCIA (Plaintiff); AGUEDA GARCIA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by CHRISTIAN GARCIA PIZANO (Plaintiff); HUGO GARCIA (Plaintiff); AGUEDA GARCIA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by CHRISTIAN GARCIA PIZANO (Plaintiff); HUGO GARCIA (Plaintiff); AGUEDA GARCIA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by CHRISTIAN GARCIA PIZANO (Plaintiff); HUGO GARCIA (Plaintiff); AGUEDA GARCIA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by CHRISTIAN GARCIA PIZANO (Plaintiff); HUGO GARCIA (Plaintiff); AGUEDA GARCIA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FCA US LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FRAZIER, CANDACE J.