This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/26/2023 at 00:19:11 (UTC).

CHRISTIAN DIOQUINO, ET AL. VS KARLA SANTILLAN

Case Summary

On 06/24/2021 CHRISTIAN DIOQUINO, filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against KARLA SANTILLAN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3449

  • Filing Date:

    06/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

DIOQUINO CHRISTIAN

DIOQUINO MICAELA

Defendant

SANTILLAN KARLA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

OBEID MARCELLE ALEXANDRA

VERA EDGAR

Defendant Attorney

WOOD CARY L.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

6/24/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

6/24/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/24/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

6/24/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

PI General Order

7/1/2021: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

7/1/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

Proof of Personal Service

7/7/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

8/5/2021: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

8/3/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Answer

8/3/2021: Answer

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

8/3/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

8/19/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

10/3/2022: [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/20/2024
  • Hearing06/20/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 30 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2023
  • Hearing08/15/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 30 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2023
  • Hearing08/01/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 30 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2022
  • Docket[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Personal Injury Courts Only (Central District); Signed and Filed by: Christian Dioquino (Plaintiff); Micaela Dioquino (Plaintiff); As to: Christian Dioquino (Plaintiff); Micaela Dioquino (Plaintiff); Karla Santillan (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2022
  • DocketPursuant to written stipulation, Final Status Conference scheduled for 12/08/2022 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 30 Not Held - Continued - Stipulation was rescheduled to 08/01/2023 10:00 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2022
  • DocketPursuant to written stipulation, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 12/22/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 30 Not Held - Continued - Stipulation was rescheduled to 08/15/2023 08:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Christian Dioquino (Plaintiff); Micaela Dioquino (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketNotice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Karla Santillan (Defendant); As to: Christian Dioquino (Plaintiff); Micaela Dioquino (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Karla Santillan (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 07/01/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 12/08/2022 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 12/22/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 06/20/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Christian Dioquino (Plaintiff); Micaela Dioquino (Plaintiff); As to: Karla Santillan (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Christian Dioquino (Plaintiff); Micaela Dioquino (Plaintiff); As to: Karla Santillan (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Christian Dioquino (Plaintiff); Micaela Dioquino (Plaintiff); As to: Karla Santillan (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Edward B. Moreton in Department 27 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer WOOD CARY L.