This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/05/2019 at 01:17:22 (UTC).

CHRISTIAN DEMARCO VS CAROL LIN MD ET AL

Case Summary

On 01/04/2018 CHRISTIAN DEMARCO filed a Contract - Professional Negligence lawsuit against CAROL LIN MD. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9191

  • Filing Date:

    01/04/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Professional Negligence

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DEMARCO CHRISTIAN

Defendants

LIN CAROL M.D.

CEDARS-SINAI MEDICAL CENTER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BROWN ALAN C.

Defendant Attorney

GONZALEZ MICHAEL D. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

3/23/2018: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

3/28/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

NOTICE OF RESCHEDULED DEMURRER AND MOTION TO STRIKE TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANTS CEDARS-SENAI MEDICAL CENTER AND CAROL LIN, M.D.

5/21/2018: NOTICE OF RESCHEDULED DEMURRER AND MOTION TO STRIKE TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANTS CEDARS-SENAI MEDICAL CENTER AND CAROL LIN, M.D.

Minute Order

6/18/2018: Minute Order

NOTICI OF CONTINUED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

6/19/2018: NOTICI OF CONTINUED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION BY DEFENDANTS CAROL LEN, MID. AND CEDARS-SINAI MEDICAL CENTER TO REQUIRE OUT OF STATE PLAINTIFF TO POST A BOND PURSUANT TO CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE ? 1030; ETC.

6/22/2018: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION BY DEFENDANTS CAROL LEN, MID. AND CEDARS-SINAI MEDICAL CENTER TO REQUIRE OUT OF STATE PLAINTIFF TO POST A BOND PURSUANT TO CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE ? 1030; ETC.

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

6/26/2018: SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

7/25/2018: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

Minute Order

8/8/2018: Minute Order

RULING RE: DEFENDANTS CEDARS-SINAI MEDICAL CENTER AND CAROL LIN, M.D.'S DEMURRER MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF THE COMPLAINT

8/8/2018: RULING RE: DEFENDANTS CEDARS-SINAI MEDICAL CENTER AND CAROL LIN, M.D.'S DEMURRER MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF THE COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF RULING RE GRANTING DEFENDANTS' DEMURRER TO ENTIRE COMPLAINT

8/9/2018: NOTICE OF RULING RE GRANTING DEFENDANTS' DEMURRER TO ENTIRE COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/RULING

8/17/2018: NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/RULING

Minute Order

4/18/2018: Minute Order

NOTICE OF HEARING AND DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANTS CEDARS-SINAI MEDICAL CENTER AND CAROL LIN, M.D.; ETC.

4/10/2018: NOTICE OF HEARING AND DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANTS CEDARS-SINAI MEDICAL CENTER AND CAROL LIN, M.D.; ETC.

DEFENDANTS CEDARS-SINAI MEDICAL CENTER AND CAROL LIN, M.D.'S DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

4/10/2018: DEFENDANTS CEDARS-SINAI MEDICAL CENTER AND CAROL LIN, M.D.'S DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

DEFENDANTS CEDARS-SINAI MEDICAL CENTER AND CAROL LIN, M.D.'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AND MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

4/10/2018: DEFENDANTS CEDARS-SINAI MEDICAL CENTER AND CAROL LIN, M.D.'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AND MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

DECLARATION OF ANDREA D. VAZQUEZ RE: MEET AND CONFER ON PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT, PURSUANT TO CCP SECTION 430.41

4/10/2018: DECLARATION OF ANDREA D. VAZQUEZ RE: MEET AND CONFER ON PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT, PURSUANT TO CCP SECTION 430.41

DECLARATION OF TRIAL ATTORNEY FOR DEFENDANTS CEDARS-SINAI MEDICAL CENTER AND CAROL LIN, M.D.

4/10/2018: DECLARATION OF TRIAL ATTORNEY FOR DEFENDANTS CEDARS-SINAI MEDICAL CENTER AND CAROL LIN, M.D.

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/17/2018
  • DocketNotice; Filed by Carol M.D. Lin (Defendant); Cedars-Sinai Medical Center (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/RULING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • Docketat 09:01 AM in Department 61; Unknown Event Type - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by Carol M.D. Lin (Defendant); Cedars-Sinai Medical Center (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF RULING RE GRANTING DEFENDANTS' DEMURRER TO ENTIRE COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2018
  • Docketat 09:01 AM in Department 61; Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike (Hearing on Demurrer; Demurrer sustained without leave) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2018
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2018
  • DocketRULING RE: DEFENDANTS CEDARS-SINAI MEDICAL CENTER AND CAROL LIN, M.D.'S DEMURRER MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF THE COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2018
  • DocketMiscellaneous-Other; Filed by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2018
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Carol M.D. Lin (Defendant); Cedars-Sinai Medical Center (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
42 More Docket Entries
  • 03/13/2018
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2018
  • DocketDECLARATION OF TREVOR J. HERRERA, ESQ. RE: PROOF OF SERVICE OF COMPLAINT TO DEFENDANTS'

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2018
  • DocketDeclaration; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2018
  • DocketOSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2018
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR PROFESSIONAL NEGLIGENCE (MEDICAL MALPRACTICE)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Christian Demarco (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Complaint Information

Alan C. Brown, Esq. SBN 166099 Su l'ior'C:)!)lu-nEof California Trevor J. Herrera, Esq. SBN 298867 ounty of Los Angeles DAY, DAY & BROWN

301 W. 1* Street, Tustin, CA 92780 MAR 09 2018

Telephone: (714) 832-4811 x228; Facsimile: (714) 832-4815 SBZWCM Deputy Gomez

Attorneys for Plaintiff, CHRISTIAN DEMARCO

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES, CENTRAL DISTRICT

CHRISTIAN DEMARCO, ) CaseNo.: BC689191 ) D@‘b\Y Plaintiff, ) Assigned to: Honorable Gregory Keosian

BY FAX -1-

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CEDARS-SINAI MEDICAL CENTER is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GONZALEZ MICHAEL D. ESQ.