Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/20/2021 at 13:58:31 (UTC).

CHRISTIAN AKRIDGE VS DAVID GRAHAM

Case Summary

On 05/21/2020 CHRISTIAN AKRIDGE filed a Contract - Business lawsuit against DAVID GRAHAM. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are BARBARA A. MEIERS and DALILA CORRAL LYONS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9385

  • Filing Date:

    05/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Business

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

BARBARA A. MEIERS

DALILA CORRAL LYONS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant

AKRIDGE CHRISTIAN DBA CHRISTIAN LEAVE

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff

GRAHAM DAVID

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorney

GRODSKY ALLEN

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

DUSHANE DAVID M

 

Court Documents

Notice of Settlement

5/6/2021: Notice of Settlement

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT) OF 05/06/2021

5/6/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT) OF 05/06/2021

Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses

4/15/2021: Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

1/4/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

12/16/2020: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO ALLOW FILING OF AMENDED ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT

11/4/2020: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO ALLOW FILING OF AMENDED ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: STIPULATIONS AND ORDERS)

11/4/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: STIPULATIONS AND ORDERS)

Answer - AMENDED ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT

11/4/2020: Answer - AMENDED ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: STIPULATIONS AND ORDERS) OF 11/04/2020

11/4/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: STIPULATIONS AND ORDERS) OF 11/04/2020

Answer

9/25/2020: Answer

Answer

8/28/2020: Answer

Cross-Complaint

9/1/2020: Cross-Complaint

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - PROOF OF SERVICE (NOT SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT) DECLARATION OF SERVICE

7/9/2020: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - PROOF OF SERVICE (NOT SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT) DECLARATION OF SERVICE

Notice of Case Management Conference

6/26/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Case Management Conference

6/26/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/21/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

5/21/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/07/2021
  • Hearing07/07/2021 at 09:00 AM in Department 12 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 12, Barbara A. Meiers, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery") - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 12, Barbara A. Meiers, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery") - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department STL-A, Dalila Corral Lyons, Presiding; MSC Timeslot (Judge Dalila Corral Lyons) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department STL-A, Dalila Corral Lyons, Presiding; MSC Timeslot (Judge Dalila Corral Lyons) - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 12, Barbara A. Meiers, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery") - Not Held - Rescheduled by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 12, Barbara A. Meiers, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery") - Not Held - Rescheduled by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • Docketat 3:00 PM in Department 12, Barbara A. Meiers, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by Christian Akridge (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Re: Notice of Settlement)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Christian Akridge (Cross-Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by David Graham (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by David Graham (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) (DECLARATION OF SERVICE); Filed by Christian Akridge (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Christian Akridge (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Christian Akridge (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Christian Akridge (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer DUSHANE DAVID M