This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/16/2023 at 04:40:51 (UTC).

CHRISCHIAUN ROBY, ET AL. VS SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON

Case Summary

On 11/17/2022 CHRISCHIAUN ROBY, filed an Other - Complex Tort/Class Action lawsuit against SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DAVID S. CUNNINGHAM III. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6363

  • Filing Date:

    11/17/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Complex Tort/Class Action

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

DAVID S. CUNNINGHAM III

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CALTRIDER EMMA

OATIES RAMEAKA

WHITE TIFFANY

Defendant

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SINGLETON GERALD

 

Court Documents

Complaint

11/17/2022: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/17/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM (CHRISTIAN ROBY)

11/18/2022: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM (CHRISTIAN ROBY)

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM (CHRISCHIAUN ROBY)

12/8/2022: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM (CHRISCHIAUN ROBY)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE. COMPLEX DETERMINATION;)

12/13/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE. COMPLEX DETERMINATION;)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE. COMPLEX DETERMINATION;) OF 12/13/2022

12/13/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE. COMPLEX DETERMINATION;) OF 12/13/2022

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

12/16/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice - NOTICE OF COURT ORDER RE COMPLEX DETERMINATION

12/19/2022: Notice - NOTICE OF COURT ORDER RE COMPLEX DETERMINATION

Proof of Service by Mail - PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF NOTICE OF COMPLEX DETERMINATION AND PAYMENT OF COMPLEX FEES

12/19/2022: Proof of Service by Mail - PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF NOTICE OF COMPLEX DETERMINATION AND PAYMENT OF COMPLEX FEES

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/19/2022
  • DocketNotice of Court Order re Complex Determination; Filed by: Chrischiaun Roby (Plaintiff); Christian Roby (Plaintiff); Emma Caltrider (Plaintiff); Tiffany White (Plaintiff); Rameaka Oaties (Plaintiff); As to: Southern California Edison (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail Of Notice of Complex Determination And Payment Of Complex Fees; Filed by: Chrischiaun Roby (Plaintiff); Christian Roby (Plaintiff); Emma Caltrider (Plaintiff); Tiffany White (Plaintiff); Rameaka Oaties (Plaintiff); As to: Southern California Edison (Defendant); After Substituted Service of Summons and Complaint ?: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Chrischiaun Roby (Plaintiff); Christian Roby (Plaintiff); Emma Caltrider (Plaintiff); Tiffany White (Plaintiff); Rameaka Oaties (Plaintiff); As to: Southern California Edison (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem (Christian Roby): Filed By: Christian Roby (Plaintiff),Emma Caltrider (Plaintiff),Rameaka Oaties (Plaintiff),Tiffany White (Plaintiff),Chrischiaun Roby (Plaintiff); Result: Granted ; Result Date changed from 11/18/2022 to 12/15/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Deemed Complex

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Stay - Deemed Complex

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Court Order Re. Complex Determination;)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re. Complex Determination;) of 12/13/2022; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • DocketThe case is removed from the special status of: Provisionally Complex Case Type

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • DocketCase reassigned to Spring Street Courthouse in Department 10 - Hon. William F. Highberger; Reason: Deemed Complex (Non-Class Action)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2022
  • DocketApplication And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem (Chrischiaun Roby); Signed and Filed by: Chrischiaun Roby (Plaintiff); Christian Roby (Plaintiff); Emma Caltrider (Plaintiff); Tiffany White (Plaintiff); Rameaka Oaties (Plaintiff); As to: Southern California Edison (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem (Chrischiaun Roby): Filed By: Tiffany White (Plaintiff),Rameaka Oaties (Plaintiff),Chrischiaun Roby (Plaintiff),Christian Roby (Plaintiff),Emma Caltrider (Plaintiff); Result: Granted ; Result Date: 12/08/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • DocketApplication And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem (Christian Roby); Signed and Filed by: Chrischiaun Roby (Plaintiff); Christian Roby (Plaintiff); Emma Caltrider (Plaintiff); Tiffany White (Plaintiff); Rameaka Oaties (Plaintiff); As to: Southern California Edison (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Provisionally Complex Case Type

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Chrischiaun Roby (Plaintiff); Christian Roby (Plaintiff); Emma Caltrider (Plaintiff); Tiffany White (Plaintiff); Rameaka Oaties (Plaintiff); As to: Southern California Edison (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Chrischiaun Roby (Plaintiff); Christian Roby (Plaintiff); Emma Caltrider (Plaintiff); Tiffany White (Plaintiff); Rameaka Oaties (Plaintiff); As to: Southern California Edison (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • DocketCase assigned in Department 11 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY is a litigant