This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/20/2022 at 07:43:35 (UTC).

CHRIS SEPULVEDA JR., A MINOR, BY AND THROUGH HIS GUARDIAN AD LITEM, JESHUALEY MEDINA VS DOWNEY REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/19/2019 CHRIS SEPULVEDA JR , A MINOR, BY AND THROUGH HIS GUARDIAN AD LITEM, JESHUALEY MEDINA filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against DOWNEY REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are BRIAN F. GASDIA, MICHAEL E. WHITAKER and OLIVIA ROSALES. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1631

  • Filing Date:

    11/19/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

BRIAN F. GASDIA

MICHAEL E. WHITAKER

OLIVIA ROSALES

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CHRIS SEPULVEDA JR. A MINOR BY AND THROUGH HIS GUARDIAN AD LITEM JESHUALEY MEDINA

Defendants

DOWNEY REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER

SUN M.D. JULIE K.

AFARI M.D. ARASH

KIM M.D. DONG H.

DOWNEY RADIOLOGY ASSOCIATES

DOWRAD MEDICAL GROUP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GLICKMAN STEVEN C.

Defendant Attorneys

PACKER ROBERT B.

PLUMA GILLIAN N

RODRIGUEZ SARA SOLEDAD

VALOFF JO LYNN

TROTTER MICHAEL

AITELLI JOHN

DEHAAS LOUIS

KIEFER MARK L.

 

Court Documents

Expedited Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proc - EXPEDITED PETITION TO APPROVE COMPROMISE OF DISPUTED CLAIM OR PENDING ACTION OR DISPOSITION OF PRO

12/8/2021: Expedited Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proc - EXPEDITED PETITION TO APPROVE COMPROMISE OF DISPUTED CLAIM OR PENDING ACTION OR DISPOSITION OF PRO

Order to Deposit Money Into Blocked Account

12/9/2021: Order to Deposit Money Into Blocked Account

Order Approving Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proceeds of Judgme - ORDER APPROVING COMPROMISE OF DISPUTED CLAIM OR PENDING ACTION OR DISPOSITION OF PROCEEDS OF JUDGM

12/9/2021: Order Approving Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proceeds of Judgme - ORDER APPROVING COMPROMISE OF DISPUTED CLAIM OR PENDING ACTION OR DISPOSITION OF PROCEEDS OF JUDGM

Request for Dismissal - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION

12/28/2021: Request for Dismissal - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION

Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

1/6/2022: Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER MODIFYING THE “ORDER APPROVING COMPROMISE OF PENDING ACTION” ENTERED ON 12/9/21

3/8/2022: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER MODIFYING THE “ORDER APPROVING COMPROMISE OF PENDING ACTION” ENTERED ON 12/9/21

Order - ORDER MODIFYING THE “ORDER APPROVING COMPROMISE OF PENDING ACTION” ENTERED ON 12/9/21

3/11/2022: Order - ORDER MODIFYING THE “ORDER APPROVING COMPROMISE OF PENDING ACTION” ENTERED ON 12/9/21

Order - ORDER MODIFYING THE “ORDER APPROVING COMPROMISE OF PENDING ACTION” ENTERED ON 12/9/21

3/11/2022: Order - ORDER MODIFYING THE “ORDER APPROVING COMPROMISE OF PENDING ACTION” ENTERED ON 12/9/21

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION EXPARTE APPLICATION FOR AN OR...)

3/11/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION EXPARTE APPLICATION FOR AN OR...)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER ADVANCING AND CONTINUING THE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ...)

10/12/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER ADVANCING AND CONTINUING THE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ...)

Request for Dismissal - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO DEFENDANT DOWNEY REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER ONLY

10/13/2021: Request for Dismissal - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO DEFENDANT DOWNEY REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER ONLY

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF HEARING ON PETITION TO APPROVE COMPROMISE OF MINORS CLAIM; NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF OSC RE DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT)

10/15/2021: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF HEARING ON PETITION TO APPROVE COMPROMISE OF MINORS CLAIM; NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF OSC RE DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT)

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF COURT ORDER ADVANCING AND VACATING HEARING DATES; NOTICE OF OSC RE DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT)

9/22/2021: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF COURT ORDER ADVANCING AND VACATING HEARING DATES; NOTICE OF OSC RE DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT)

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

9/22/2021: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Notice - NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE CONTACT FOR DEFENDANT DONG H. KIM, M.D.

9/1/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE CONTACT FOR DEFENDANT DONG H. KIM, M.D.

Notice of Settlement

9/8/2021: Notice of Settlement

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER ADVANCING AND VACATING HEARING DATES:) OF 09/13/2021

9/13/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER ADVANCING AND VACATING HEARING DATES:) OF 09/13/2021

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER ADVANCING AND VACATING HEARING DATES:)

9/13/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER ADVANCING AND VACATING HEARING DATES:)

81 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/15/2022
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department F; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department C, Olivia Rosales, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department R, Brian F. Gasdia, Presiding; Hearing on Ex Parte Application (Exparte Application For An Order Modifying The Order Approving Compromise Of Pending Action Entered on 12-9-2021) - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department R, Brian F. Gasdia, Presiding; Ex-Parte Proceedings (Request Order to Modify Court's order of 12/9/21)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application Exparte Application For An Or...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • DocketOrder (MODIFYING THE ORDER APPROVING COMPROMISE OF PENDING ACTION ENTERED ON 12/9/21); Filed by CHRIS SEPULVEDA JR., a minor, by and through his Guardian Ad Litem, JESHUALEY MEDINA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department C, Olivia Rosales, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Summary Adjudication - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department C, Olivia Rosales, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • DocketEx Parte Application (FOR AN ORDER MODIFYING THE ORDER APPROVING COMPROMISE OF PENDING ACTION ENTERED ON 12/9/21); Filed by CHRIS SEPULVEDA JR., a minor, by and through his Guardian Ad Litem, JESHUALEY MEDINA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department F; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
105 More Docket Entries
  • 04/21/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by CHRIS SEPULVEDA JR., a minor, by and through his Guardian Ad Litem, JESHUALEY MEDINA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by CHRIS SEPULVEDA JR., a minor, by and through his Guardian Ad Litem, JESHUALEY MEDINA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by CHRIS SEPULVEDA JR., a minor, by and through his Guardian Ad Litem, JESHUALEY MEDINA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2020
  • DocketApplication And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem (for Chris); Filed by CHRIS SEPULVEDA JR., a minor, by and through his Guardian Ad Litem, JESHUALEY MEDINA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by CHRIS SEPULVEDA JR., a minor, by and through his Guardian Ad Litem, JESHUALEY MEDINA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by CHRIS SEPULVEDA JR., a minor, by and through his Guardian Ad Litem, JESHUALEY MEDINA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • DocketApplication And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem (already signed); Filed by CHRIS SEPULVEDA JR., a minor, by and through his Guardian Ad Litem, JESHUALEY MEDINA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DOWRAD MEDICAL GROUP is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GLICKMAN STEVEN C. ESQ.