This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/28/2021 at 04:09:13 (UTC).

CHRIS SCOTT VS INTER INSURANCE EXCHANGE OF THE AUTOMOBILE CLUB

Case Summary

On 02/03/2021 CHRIS SCOTT filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against INTER INSURANCE EXCHANGE OF THE AUTOMOBILE CLUB. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MARK V. MOONEY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4349

  • Filing Date:

    02/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MARK V. MOONEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SCOTT CHRIS

Defendant

INTER INSURANCE EXCHANGE OF THE AUTOMOBILE CLUB

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

GRAHAM BRUCE N

GRAHAM BRUCE N.

Defendant Attorney

CASTRONOVO TOD MICHAEL

 

Court Documents

Complaint

2/3/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

2/3/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/3/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

2/3/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

2/19/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

3/8/2021: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Proof of Personal Service

3/5/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Case Management Statement

2/26/2021: Case Management Statement

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

5/7/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Answer

5/7/2021: Answer

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

5/27/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Case Management Statement

5/26/2021: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; POST-MEDIATION STATUS CONFERENCE;)

8/11/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; POST-MEDIATION STATUS CONFERENCE;)

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/14/2022
  • Hearing11/14/2022 at 09:30 AM in Department 68 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • Hearing11/04/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 68 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 68, Mark V. Mooney, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 68, Mark V. Mooney, Presiding; Post-Mediation Status Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Post-Mediation Status Conference;)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 68, Mark V. Mooney, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Inter Insurance Exchange of the Automobile Club (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Inter Insurance Exchange of the Automobile Club (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Inter Insurance Exchange of the Automobile Club (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Chris Scott (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Chris Scott (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Chris Scott (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Chris Scott (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Chris Scott (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Chris Scott (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where INTER INSURANCE EXCHANGE OF THE AUTOMOBILE CLUB is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CASTRONOVO TOD M. ESQ.