This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/15/2021 at 04:19:44 (UTC).

CHRIS LANGER VS SUNSET SUBSIDIARY LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 04/07/2021 CHRIS LANGER filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against SUNSET SUBSIDIARY LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0627

  • Filing Date:

    04/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LANGER CHRIS

Defendants

MONTAGE HOTELS & RESORTS LLC A NEVADA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

SUNSET SUBSIDIARY LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HANDY RUSSELL CLIVE

 

Court Documents

Complaint

4/7/2021: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

4/7/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

4/7/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

4/7/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/7/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

5/20/2021: Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

Notice of Settlement

5/20/2021: Notice of Settlement

Notice of Remand from Federal Court - NOTICE OF REMAND FROM FEDERAL COURT BACK TO SUPERIOR COURT

5/18/2021: Notice of Remand from Federal Court - NOTICE OF REMAND FROM FEDERAL COURT BACK TO SUPERIOR COURT

Notice of Removal to Federal Court

5/11/2021: Notice of Removal to Federal Court

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

5/11/2021: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Proof of Personal Service

4/15/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

4/14/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

7/12/2021: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Request for Dismissal

7/9/2021: Request for Dismissal

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/12/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department P; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) (After Notice of Settlement of the Entire Case filed by Plaintiff) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Chris Langer (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Chris Langer (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by Chris Langer (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • DocketNotice of Remand from Federal Court (back to Superior Court); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Sunset Subsidiary LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company (Defendant); Montage Hotels & Resorts, LLC, a Nevada Limited Liability Company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • DocketNotice of Removal to Federal Court; Filed by Sunset Subsidiary LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company (Defendant); Montage Hotels & Resorts, LLC, a Nevada Limited Liability Company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Chris Langer (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Chris Langer (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Chris Langer (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Chris Langer (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Chris Langer (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less