This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/07/2022 at 04:13:38 (UTC).

CHRIS LANGER VS COMPANY OF ANGELS, INC., A CALIFORNIA NONPROFIT CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 07/29/2021 CHRIS LANGER filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against COMPANY OF ANGELS, INC , A CALIFORNIA NONPROFIT CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is STEVEN J. KLEIFIELD. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8168

  • Filing Date:

    07/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

STEVEN J. KLEIFIELD

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LANGER CHRIS

Defendant

COMPANY OF ANGELS INC. A CALIFORNIA NONPROFIT CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HANDY RUSSELL

Defendant Attorney

FRIEDENTHAL DANIEL RAY

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT))

10/4/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT))

Request for Dismissal

10/4/2022: Request for Dismissal

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

12/6/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

7/8/2022: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Notice of Settlement

8/1/2022: Notice of Settlement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT)

8/9/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT) OF 08/09/2022

8/9/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT) OF 08/09/2022

Proof of Service by Mail

8/15/2022: Proof of Service by Mail

Notice - NOTICE OF INABILITY TO DISMISS AND REQUEST TO SET CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

9/6/2022: Notice - NOTICE OF INABILITY TO DISMISS AND REQUEST TO SET CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Case Management Statement

11/18/2021: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

11/19/2021: Case Management Statement

Answer

9/8/2021: Answer

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

9/8/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Notice of Case Management Conference

8/5/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Proof of Service by Mail

8/10/2021: Proof of Service by Mail

Proof of Personal Service

8/13/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

7/29/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/29/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/04/2022
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Chris Langer on 07/29/2021, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Chris Langer as to the entire action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Chris Langer (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) scheduled for 10/04/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 57 updated: Result Date to 10/04/2022; Result Type to Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • DocketNotice of inability to dismiss and Request to set case management conference; Filed by: Chris Langer (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by: Chris Langer (Plaintiff); As to: Company of Angels, Inc., a California Nonprofit Corporation (Defendant); After Substituted Service of Summons and Complaint ?: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) scheduled for 10/04/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 57

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Court Order Re: Notice of Settlement)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re: Notice of Settlement) of 08/09/2022; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Final Status Conference scheduled for 08/18/2023 at 09:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 57 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 08/09/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Company of Angels, Inc., a California Nonprofit Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Chris Langer (Plaintiff); As to: Company of Angels, Inc., a California Nonprofit Corporation (Defendant); Service Date: 08/09/2021; Service Cost: 35.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by: Chris Langer (Plaintiff); As to: Company of Angels, Inc., a California Nonprofit Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 12/06/2021 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 57

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Steven J. Kleifield in Department 57 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Chris Langer (Plaintiff); As to: Company of Angels, Inc., a California Nonprofit Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Chris Langer (Plaintiff); As to: Company of Angels, Inc., a California Nonprofit Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Chris Langer (Plaintiff); As to: Company of Angels, Inc., a California Nonprofit Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ANGELS, INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HANDY RUSSELL ESQ.