This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/11/2022 at 06:46:31 (UTC).

CHOON KEUN SON, ET AL. VS SANG BONG PAK, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 01/12/2022 CHOON KEUN SON filed a Property - Construction Defect lawsuit against SANG BONG PAK. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is THERESA M. TRABER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1408

  • Filing Date:

    01/12/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Construction Defect

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

THERESA M. TRABER

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

SON CHOON KEUN

SON SOON JA

THE SON FAMILY TRUST

Cross Plaintiffs, Defendants and Cross Defendants

ASIA GENERAL CONSTRUCTION INC.

HUDSON INSURANCE COMPANY

PAK SANG BONG DBA STEVE CONSTRUCTION

SURETEC INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendants, Cross Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

PAK SANG BONG DBA STEVE CONSTRUCTION

SON CHOON KEUN

SON SOON JA

CHOON KEUN SON AND SOON JA SON AS CO-TRUSTEE OF THE SON FAMILY TRUST

CHOON KEUN SON AS CO-TRUSTEES OF THE SON FAMILY TRUST

MOES 1 THROUGH 50 INCLUSIVE

SOON JA SON AS CO-TRUSTEES OF THE SON FAMILY TRUST

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

BALDINO RYAN

BALDINO RYAN WALTER

BALDINO RYAN W.

Defendant Attorneys

ACKER STEPHEN

FELDMAN IAN

NUNN ROSEMARY W.

FELDMAN IAN R.

Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

CAMERON CLARK HOWARD

CAMERON CLARK H.

 

Court Documents

Case Management Statement

3/22/2022: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

3/25/2022: Case Management Statement

Answer

3/25/2022: Answer

Case Management Statement

3/25/2022: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

3/28/2022: Case Management Statement

Answer

4/1/2022: Answer

Association of Attorney - ASSOCIATION OF ATTORNEY NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL

4/11/2022: Association of Attorney - ASSOCIATION OF ATTORNEY NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: [CROSS-REFERENCE TO CASE NUMBER: ...)

4/11/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: [CROSS-REFERENCE TO CASE NUMBER: ...)

Answer

2/17/2022: Answer

Cross-Complaint

2/17/2022: Cross-Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON CROSS COMPLAINT

2/18/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON CROSS COMPLAINT

Answer

3/1/2022: Answer

Cross-Complaint

3/1/2022: Cross-Complaint

Answer

3/3/2022: Answer

Cross-Complaint

3/3/2022: Cross-Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

3/3/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

3/3/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Proof of Personal Service

2/8/2022: Proof of Personal Service

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/17/2023
  • Hearing07/17/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 47 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2023
  • Hearing06/30/2023 at 09:00 AM in Department 47 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • Hearing09/14/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 47 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Post-Mediation Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 47, Theresa M. Traber, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: [cross-reference to case number: ...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • DocketAssociation of Attorney (NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL); Filed by ASIA GENERAL CONSTRUCTION, INC. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by SURETEC INSURANCE COMPANY (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by SANG BONG PAK (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by CHOON KEUN SON (Cross-Defendant); SOON JA SON (Cross-Defendant); Choon Keun Son and Soon Ja Son, as Co-Trustee of the Son Family Trust, Dated February 14, 2007 (Cross-Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by ASIA GENERAL CONSTRUCTION, INC. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 02/09/2022
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by CHOON KEUN SON (Plaintiff); SOON JA SON (Plaintiff); THE SON FAMILY TRUST DATED FEBRUARY 14, 2007 (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • DocketProof of Mailing (Substituted Service); Filed by CHOON KEUN SON (Plaintiff); SOON JA SON (Plaintiff); THE SON FAMILY TRUST DATED FEBRUARY 14, 2007 (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by CHOON KEUN SON (Plaintiff); SOON JA SON (Plaintiff); THE SON FAMILY TRUST DATED FEBRUARY 14, 2007 (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by CHOON KEUN SON (Plaintiff); SOON JA SON (Plaintiff); THE SON FAMILY TRUST DATED FEBRUARY 14, 2007 (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by CHOON KEUN SON (Plaintiff); SOON JA SON (Plaintiff); THE SON FAMILY TRUST DATED FEBRUARY 14, 2007 (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by CHOON KEUN SON (Plaintiff); SOON JA SON (Plaintiff); THE SON FAMILY TRUST DATED FEBRUARY 14, 2007 (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by CHOON KEUN SON (Plaintiff); SOON JA SON (Plaintiff); THE SON FAMILY TRUST DATED FEBRUARY 14, 2007 (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by CHOON KEUN SON (Plaintiff); SOON JA SON (Plaintiff); THE SON FAMILY TRUST DATED FEBRUARY 14, 2007 (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SURETEC INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where Hudson Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BALDINO RYAN