This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/29/2020 at 07:35:11 (UTC).

CHONG LIN LIU VS CAMERON ANTHONY LAMAR BOYD ET AL

Case Summary

On 05/31/2018 CHONG LIN LIU filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against CAMERON ANTHONY LAMAR BOYD. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are CHRISTOPHER K. LUI and DANIEL M. CROWLEY. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8324

  • Filing Date:

    05/31/2018

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

CHRISTOPHER K. LUI

DANIEL M. CROWLEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

LIU CHONG LIN

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1 TO 20

BOYD TOSHA JEANINE

BOYD CAMERON ANTHONY LAMAR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

LOMBARDI CHRISTOPHER

LOMBARDI GUY CHRISTOPHER

Defendant Attorney

COLMEY MARIE ELIZABETH

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

9/16/2020: Request for Dismissal

Notice of Settlement

7/21/2020: Notice of Settlement

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 07/21/2020

7/21/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 07/21/2020

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

7/21/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 04/03/2020

4/3/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 04/03/2020

Notice of Ruling

2/14/2020: Notice of Ruling

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF CHONG LIN LIU'S COMPLI...)

2/14/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF CHONG LIN LIU'S COMPLI...)

Opposition - OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL COMPLIANCE

1/16/2020: Opposition - OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL COMPLIANCE

Reply - REPLY TO PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL COMPLIANCE

1/23/2020: Reply - REPLY TO PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL COMPLIANCE

[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

1/30/2020: [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF'S COMPLIANCE WITH PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS' DEMAND FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS, SET ONE

12/26/2019: Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF'S COMPLIANCE WITH PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS' DEMAND FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS, SET ONE

[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

10/4/2019: [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

Answer - Answer to complaint on behalf of defendants Cameron Anthony lamar boyd

10/19/2018: Answer - Answer to complaint on behalf of defendants Cameron Anthony lamar boyd

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

10/30/2018: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Demand for Jury Trial

10/30/2018: Demand for Jury Trial

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

8/14/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

8/14/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES) -

5/31/2018: COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES) -

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/28/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 28, Daniel M. Crowley, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Cameron Anthony Lamar Boyd (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 28, Daniel M. Crowley, Presiding; Trial Setting Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • Docketat 3:14 PM in Department 28, Daniel M. Crowley, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by Chong Lin Liu (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 07/21/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 28, Daniel M. Crowley, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2020
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 28, Daniel M. Crowley, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • Docketat 09:23 AM in Department 28, Daniel M. Crowley, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 10/30/2018
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by Cameron Anthony Lamar Boyd (Defendant); Tosha Jeanine Boyd (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2018
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Cameron Anthony Lamar Boyd (Defendant); Tosha Jeanine Boyd (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2018
  • DocketAnswer (to complaint on behalf of defendants Cameron Anthony lamar boyd); Filed by Cameron Anthony Lamar Boyd (Defendant); Tosha Jeanine Boyd (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2018
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Chong Lin Liu (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2018
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Chong Lin Liu (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Chong Lin Liu (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC708324    Hearing Date: February 14, 2020    Dept: 28

Motion to Compel Responses to Request for Production (Set One)

Having considered the moving, opposing, and reply papers, the Court rules as follows.

BACKGROUND

On May 31, 2018, Plaintiff Chong Lin Liu (“Liu”) filed a complaint against Defendants Cameron Anthony Lamar Boyd and Tosha Jeanine Boyd (“Defendants”).  The complaint alleges motor vehicle negligence for an incident that occurred on November 7, 2017.

On December 26, 2019, Defendants filed a motion to compel Plaintiff to provide verified responses without objections to Request for Production (Set One) pursuant to California Code of Civil Procedure section 2031.300.

Trial is set for May 28, 2020.

PARTIES REQUESTS

Defendants ask the Court to compel Plaintiff to serve verified responses without objections to Request for Production of Documents (Set One) due to Plaintiff’s failure to serve sufficient responses.

Defendant also asks the Court to impose $1,355 in monetary sanctions against Plaintiff and Plaintiff’s counsel for their abuse of the discovery process.

LEGAL STANDARD

“Parties must participate in an [Informal Discovery Conference] before a Motion to Compel Further Responses to Discovery will be heard unless the moving party submits evidence, by way of declaration, that the opposing party as failed or refused to participate in an [Informal Discovery Conference.]  (LA Superior Court Standing Order; April 16, 2018, ¶ 5 (emphasis in original).)  A motion to compel further is the appropriate motion when the responding party provides a response to the propounded discovery.  (See Deyo v. Kilbourne  (1978) 84 Cal.App.3d 771, 788.)

DISCUSSION

On October 22, 2018, Defendants served Request for Production (Set One) on Plaintiff by U.S. mail.  (Colmey Decl., ¶ 2, Exh. A.)  On February 14, 2019, Plaintiff served verified responses to Defendants’ Request for Production (Set One) by U.S. mail.  (Colmey Decl., 3, Exh. B.)  On September 27, 2019, Defendants served Supplemental Request for Production of Documents on Plaintiff by U.S. mail.  (Colmey Decl., 5, Exh. C.)  On December 5, 2019, Plaintiff served a response to DefendantsSupplemental Request for Production of Documents on Defendants by U.S. mail.  (Colmey Decl., 8, Exh. E.)

The Court finds Defendants have filed the wrong motion.  A motion to compel documents is proper when a party is requested to serve responses and fails to do so.  Here, Plaintiff served responses to Defendants’ requests for production.  Defendants contend Plaintiff’s responses are deficient.  As such, Defendants must file a motion to compel further pursuant to California Code of Civil Procedure section 2031.310 and participate in an Informal Discovery Conference before the hearing on the motion.

CONCLUSION

The motion is DENIED.

Defendants are ordered to give notice of this ruling.