This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/18/2023 at 00:51:04 (UTC).

CHONA BROWN VS FIRST MOTOR GROUP OF LOS ANGELES, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 09/30/2022 CHONA BROWN filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against FIRST MOTOR GROUP OF LOS ANGELES,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is UPINDER S. KALRA. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1965

  • Filing Date:

    09/30/2022

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

UPINDER S. KALRA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BROWN CHONA

Defendants

FIRST MOTOR GROUP OF LOS ANGELES DBA KIA DOWNTOWN LOS ANGELES

KIA FINANCE AMERICA

WESTCHESTER FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FALER MATTHEW

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

4/13/2023: Request for Dismissal

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE;)

2/16/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE;)

Case Management Statement

1/25/2023: Case Management Statement

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

10/6/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Request for Dismissal

10/6/2022: Request for Dismissal

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

9/30/2022: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

9/30/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

9/30/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

9/30/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Notice of Case Management Conference

9/30/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

9/30/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Statement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death)

9/30/2022: Statement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death)

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/30/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

9/30/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

9/30/2022: Complaint

Affidavit - AFFIDAVIT OF VENUE

9/30/2022: Affidavit - AFFIDAVIT OF VENUE

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

10/3/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

10/3/2022: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/14/2023
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Chona Brown on 09/30/2022, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Chona Brown as to the entire action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) scheduled for 04/18/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 51 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 04/14/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2023
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Chona Brown (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) scheduled for 04/18/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 51

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Case Management Conference;)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 02/16/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 51 Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court on 02/16/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Request for Dismissal as to Westchester Fire Insurance Company only: Name Extension: as to Westchester Fire Insurance Company only ; As To Parties changed from Westchester Fire Insurance Company (Defendant) to Westchester Fire Insurance Company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by: Chona Brown (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Chona Brown on 09/30/2022, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Chona Brown as to Westchester Fire Insurance Company

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Chona Brown (Plaintiff); As to: First Motor Group of Los Angeles (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 10/05/2022; Service Cost: 95.08; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 09/30/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Upinder S. Kalra in Department 51 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); TP by:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Chona Brown (Plaintiff); As to: First Motor Group of Los Angeles (Defendant); Kia Finance America (Defendant); Westchester Fire Insurance Company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • DocketAffidavit Of Venue; Filed by: Chona Brown (Plaintiff); As to: First Motor Group of Los Angeles (Defendant); Kia Finance America (Defendant); Westchester Fire Insurance Company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • DocketStatement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death); Filed by: Chona Brown (Plaintiff); As to: First Motor Group of Los Angeles (Defendant); Kia Finance America (Defendant); Westchester Fire Insurance Company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Chona Brown (Plaintiff); As to: First Motor Group of Los Angeles (Defendant); Kia Finance America (Defendant); Westchester Fire Insurance Company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less