This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/19/2021 at 04:00:33 (UTC).

CHOE, SOOK JA VS CHOE, KYUNG SOOK

Case Summary

On 11/23/2020 CHOE, SOOK JA filed a Family - Harassment lawsuit against CHOE, KYUNG SOOK. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are COWAN, DAVID J., ARIAN, LEE S., RIFF, LAWRENCE P. and BYRD, CHRISTINE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6403

  • Filing Date:

    11/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Harassment

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

COWAN, DAVID J.

ARIAN, LEE S.

RIFF, LAWRENCE P.

BYRD, CHRISTINE

 

Party Details

Petitioner

CHOE SOOK JA

Respondent

CHOE KYUNG SOOK

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

LIM SHI YOUNG

 

Court Documents

Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109)

11/23/2020: Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109)

Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110)

11/23/2020: Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110)

Petition - Civil Harassment

11/23/2020: Petition - Civil Harassment

Response - Civil Harassment

12/9/2020: Response - Civil Harassment

Minute Order

12/15/2020: Minute Order

Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

12/15/2020: Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

Notice - Of Related Case

1/6/2021: Notice - Of Related Case

Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

1/5/2021: Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

Minute Order

1/5/2021: Minute Order

Minute Order

1/28/2021: Minute Order

Minute Order

1/20/2021: Minute Order

Minute Order

2/10/2021: Minute Order

Minute Order

2/10/2021: Minute Order

Restraining Order After Hearing (Form 130)

2/10/2021: Restraining Order After Hearing (Form 130)

Stipulation and Order - Receipt and Order Re: Release of Exhibits

2/10/2021: Stipulation and Order - Receipt and Order Re: Release of Exhibits

Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

1/20/2021: Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/10/2021
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department 42, Byrd, Christine, Presiding; Restraining Order Hearing - Granted - RO Before Evidence by both

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department 2, Riff, Lawrence P., Presiding; Restraining Order Hearing - Transfer - Different Department- This Hearing Only

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • DocketRestraining Order After Hearing (Form 130); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • DocketStipulation and Order (Receipt and Order Re: Release of Exhibits ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • Docketat 3:00 PM in Stanley Mosk Dept. - 1, Cowan, David J., Presiding; Non-Appearance Case Review - Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department 2, Riff, Lawrence P., Presiding; Restraining Order Hearing - Held - Continued, TRO Reissued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • DocketNotice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 01/05/2021
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department 25, Arian, Lee S., Presiding; Restraining Order Hearing - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • DocketNotice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 25, Arian, Lee S., Presiding; Restraining Order Hearing - Held - Continued, TRO Reissued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • DocketNotice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • DocketResponse - Civil Harassment; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • DocketNotice - Court Hearing (Form 109); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order (Form 110); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • DocketPetition - Civil Harassment; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer LIM SHI YOUNG