This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/03/2023 at 08:15:48 (UTC).

CHIQUISHA NISHA ANDREWS VS DRIVETIME CAR SALES COMPANY, LLC

Case Summary

On 07/25/2022 CHIQUISHA NISHA ANDREWS filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against DRIVETIME CAR SALES COMPANY, LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is AUDRA MORI. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3838

  • Filing Date:

    07/25/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

AUDRA MORI

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ANDREWS CHIQUISHA NISHA

Defendant

DRIVETIME CAR SALES COMPANY LLC DBA DRIVETIME

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

HOVSEPYAN KRISTINA B.

WALSER-JOLLY GENEVIEVE

 

Court Documents

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

7/25/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

7/25/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Unknown - SEVENTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR PROCEDURES IN THE PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURTS

7/25/2022: Unknown - SEVENTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR PROCEDURES IN THE PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURTS

Unknown - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL PERSONAL INJURY CASE

7/25/2022: Unknown - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL PERSONAL INJURY CASE

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

7/25/2022: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

7/25/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/25/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

7/25/2022: Complaint

Answer

8/26/2022: Answer

Notice of Related Case

11/29/2022: Notice of Related Case

Notice of Related Case

11/29/2022: Notice of Related Case

Motion to Reclassify

12/7/2022: Motion to Reclassify

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 01/04/2023

1/4/2023: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 01/04/2023

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

1/4/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/04/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Court Order)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of 01/04/2023; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Final Status Conference scheduled for 01/08/2024 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 31 Not Held - Advanced and Vacated on 01/04/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 01/22/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 31 Not Held - Advanced and Vacated on 01/04/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 07/22/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 31 Not Held - Advanced and Vacated on 01/04/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Hearing on Motion to Reclassify (Walker Motion) scheduled for 01/10/2023 at 01:30 PM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 31 Not Held - Advanced and Vacated on 01/04/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • DocketMotion to Reclassify; Filed by: Drivetime Car Sales Company, LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Motion to Reclassify DEFENDANT DRIVETIME CAR SALES COMPANY, LLC DBA DRIVETIMES MOTION FOR RECLASSIFICATION: Name Extension: DEFENDANT DRIVETIME CAR SALES COMPANY, LLC DBA DRIVETIMES MOTION FOR RECLASSIFICATION ; As To Parties:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • DocketHearing on Motion to Reclassify (Walker Motion) scheduled for 01/10/2023 at 01:30 PM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 31

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Notice of Related Case: Filed By: Drivetime Car Sales Company, LLC (Defendant); Result: Reviewed - No Action Required ; As To Parties:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 07/25/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 01/22/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 31

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 07/22/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 31

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Chiquisha Nisha Andrews (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: Chiquisha Nisha Andrews (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Chiquisha Nisha Andrews (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • DocketSeventh Amended Standing Order for Procedures in the Personal Injury Hub Courts; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Personal Injury Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less