This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/12/2019 at 15:46:16 (UTC).

CHIMA A. ANYANWU VS. FELICIA EKEKE, ET-AL

Case Summary

On 02/15/2017 CHIMA A ANYANWU filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against FELICIA EKEKE, ET-AL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Compton Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MAURICE A. LEITER. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8719

  • Filing Date:

    02/15/2017

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Compton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MAURICE A. LEITER

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

ANYANWU CHIMA

ANYANWU CHIMA A.

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

EKEKE FELICIA

DOES 1 THROUGH 10 INCLUSIVE

Other

LOS ANGELES SUPERIOR COURT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ANYANWU CHIMA LAW OFFICES OF

Defendant Attorney

CHUKWUDOBE OKEY GEORGE

 

Court Documents

Notice of Related Case

2/15/2017: Notice of Related Case

Summons

2/15/2017: Summons

Unknown

4/6/2017: Unknown

Minute Order

4/10/2017: Minute Order

Minute Order

4/20/2017: Minute Order

Minute Order

7/19/2017: Minute Order

Notice of Ruling

8/23/2017: Notice of Ruling

Unknown

9/19/2017: Unknown

Unknown

10/27/2017: Unknown

Unknown

11/7/2017: Unknown

Minute Order

11/14/2017: Minute Order

Cross-Complaint

11/17/2017: Cross-Complaint

Unknown

12/22/2017: Unknown

Minute Order

1/22/2018: Minute Order

Other -

3/6/2018: Other -

Minute Order

11/14/2018: Minute Order

Minute Order

12/19/2018: Minute Order

Ex Parte Application

12/19/2018: Ex Parte Application

30 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/22/2019
  • at 09:30 AM in Department A, Maurice A. Leiter, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • at 09:30 AM in Department A, Maurice A. Leiter, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (Dismissal Pursuant to California Rules of Court, Rule 3.1385(b) and (c) with the Court to Retain Jurisdiction Pursuant to Code of Civil Procedure 664) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by Chima A. Anyanwu (Legacy Party); FELICIA EKEKE (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • at 09:30 AM in Department A, Maurice A. Leiter, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • at 09:30 AM in Department A, Maurice A. Leiter, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • Minute Order ((Final Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department A, Maurice A. Leiter, Presiding; Hearing on Ex Parte Application (to Continue Trial) - Held - Motion Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • Minute Order ((Hearing on Ex Parte Application to Continue Trial)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • Ex Parte Application (to Continue Trial); Filed by FELICIA EKEKE (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • at 09:30 AM in Department A, Maurice A. Leiter, Presiding; Post-Mediation Status Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
41 More Docket Entries
  • 07/12/2017
  • Opposition; Filed by Chima A. Anyanwu (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2017
  • at 08:30 AM in Department A; Court Order (Court Order; Court Makes Order) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2017
  • Minute order entered: 2017-04-20 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2017
  • at 4:00 PM in Department B; Court Order (Court Order; Court Makes Order) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2017
  • Minute order entered: 2017-04-10 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2017
  • Demurrer; Filed by FELICIA EKEKE (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2017
  • Summons (on Complaint)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2017
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2017
  • Notice of Related Case; Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less