This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/01/2022 at 04:59:47 (UTC).

CHILLER SERVICES RIGGING & DEMO, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ET AL. VS ATKINSON, ANDELSON, LOYA, RUUD & ROMO, A PROFESSIONAL LAW CORPORATION, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 04/30/2021 CHILLER SERVICES RIGGING DEMO, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, filed a Contract - Professional Negligence lawsuit against ATKINSON, ANDELSON, LOYA, RUUD ROMO, A PROFESSIONAL LAW CORPORATION, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MARK V. MOONEY. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6344

  • Filing Date:

    04/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Professional Negligence

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MARK V. MOONEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

KOLSTAD BRUCE

RAGAN DAN

CHILLER SERVICES RIGGING & DEMO INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Defendants

HABERBUSH LLP A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY PARTNERSHIP

NOVOTNY RONALD WAYNE

ATKINSON ANDELSON LOYA RUUD & ROMO A PROFESSIONAL LAW CORPORATION A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

HABERBUSH DAVID RICHARD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

ETEHAD SIMON P.

SHAFFIE SHAWN

COMER KIRK S.

PARKER DAVID B.

Defendant Attorneys

KJAR JAMES J.

BUCHANAN ALISON PAIGE

EMDEE GREGORY BRIAN

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

8/5/2022: Request for Dismissal

Association of Attorney

6/21/2022: Association of Attorney

Association of Attorney

6/21/2022: Association of Attorney

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (POST-ARBITRATION STATUS CONFERENCE AS TO ATKINSON, ANDELSON, ...)

1/24/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (POST-ARBITRATION STATUS CONFERENCE AS TO ATKINSON, ANDELSON, ...)

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

1/6/2022: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Case Management Statement

1/6/2022: Case Management Statement

Order - ORDER [PROPOSED] ORDER RE PETITION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

8/5/2021: Order - ORDER [PROPOSED] ORDER RE PETITION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR ORDER

8/25/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR ORDER

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITH MOTION TO STRIKE (CCP 430.10); H...)

7/26/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITH MOTION TO STRIKE (CCP 430.10); H...)

Case Management Statement

7/19/2021: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

7/19/2021: Case Management Statement

Brief - BRIEF SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF OF PLAINTIFFS IN OPPOSITION TO PETITION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND STAY OF PROCEEDINGS

7/22/2021: Brief - BRIEF SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF OF PLAINTIFFS IN OPPOSITION TO PETITION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND STAY OF PROCEEDINGS

Brief - BRIEF SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF PETITION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

7/16/2021: Brief - BRIEF SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF PETITION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

Reply - REPLY DEFENDANT HABERBUSH, LLP AND DAVID RICHARD HABERBUSHS REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO STRIKE PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT

7/19/2021: Reply - REPLY DEFENDANT HABERBUSH, LLP AND DAVID RICHARD HABERBUSHS REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO STRIKE PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT

Reply - REPLY DEFENDANTS DAVID RICHARD HABERBUSH AND HABERBUSH LLPS REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEMURER TO PLANTIFFS COMPLAINT

7/19/2021: Reply - REPLY DEFENDANTS DAVID RICHARD HABERBUSH AND HABERBUSH LLPS REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEMURER TO PLANTIFFS COMPLAINT

Notice of Intent to Appear by Telephone

7/19/2021: Notice of Intent to Appear by Telephone

Case Management Statement

7/19/2021: Case Management Statement

Opposition - OPPOSITION MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO STRIKE OF DEFENDANTS HABERBUSH, LLP AND DAVID RICHARD HABERBUSH

7/13/2021: Opposition - OPPOSITION MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO STRIKE OF DEFENDANTS HABERBUSH, LLP AND DAVID RICHARD HABERBUSH

28 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/05/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by CHILLER SERVICES RIGGING & DEMO, INC., a California corporation (Plaintiff); DAN RAGAN (Plaintiff); BRUCE KOLSTAD (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • DocketAssociation of Attorney; Filed by CHILLER SERVICES RIGGING & DEMO, INC., a California corporation (Plaintiff); DAN RAGAN (Plaintiff); BRUCE KOLSTAD (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • DocketAssociation of Attorney; Filed by CHILLER SERVICES RIGGING & DEMO, INC., a California corporation (Plaintiff); DAN RAGAN (Plaintiff); BRUCE KOLSTAD (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 68, Mark V. Mooney, Presiding; Post-Arbitration Status Conference (as to Atkinson, Andelson, Loya, Ruud & Romo, APLC and Ronald Novotny) - Held - Continued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Post-Arbitration Status Conference as to Atkinson, Andelson, ...)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by ATKINSON, ANDELSON, LOYA, RUUD & ROMO, A PROFESSIONAL LAW CORPORATION, a California corporation (Defendant); RONALD WAYNE NOVOTNY (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by ATKINSON, ANDELSON, LOYA, RUUD & ROMO, A PROFESSIONAL LAW CORPORATION, a California corporation (Defendant); RONALD WAYNE NOVOTNY (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketNotice (of Entry of Judgment or Order); Filed by ATKINSON, ANDELSON, LOYA, RUUD & ROMO, A PROFESSIONAL LAW CORPORATION, a California corporation (Defendant); RONALD WAYNE NOVOTNY (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketOrder ([Proposed] Order re Petition to Compel Arbitration); Filed by ATKINSON, ANDELSON, LOYA, RUUD & ROMO, A PROFESSIONAL LAW CORPORATION, a California corporation (Defendant); RONALD WAYNE NOVOTNY (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 68; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
25 More Docket Entries
  • 05/21/2021
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by CHILLER SERVICES RIGGING & DEMO, INC., a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by CHILLER SERVICES RIGGING & DEMO, INC., a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • DocketNotice (of Case Management Conference); Filed by CHILLER SERVICES RIGGING & DEMO, INC., a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by CHILLER SERVICES RIGGING & DEMO, INC., a California corporation (Plaintiff); DAN RAGAN (Plaintiff); BRUCE KOLSTAD (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by CHILLER SERVICES RIGGING & DEMO, INC., a California corporation (Plaintiff); DAN RAGAN (Plaintiff); BRUCE KOLSTAD (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by CHILLER SERVICES RIGGING & DEMO, INC., a California corporation (Plaintiff); DAN RAGAN (Plaintiff); BRUCE KOLSTAD (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by CHILLER SERVICES RIGGING & DEMO, INC., a California corporation (Plaintiff); DAN RAGAN (Plaintiff); BRUCE KOLSTAD (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by CHILLER SERVICES RIGGING & DEMO, INC., a California corporation (Plaintiff); DAN RAGAN (Plaintiff); BRUCE KOLSTAD (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less