This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/14/2019 at 01:01:59 (UTC).

CHILD WELFARE SERVICES VS CHEN, IRINA

Case Summary

On 07/06/2018 CHILD WELFARE SERVICES filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against CHEN, IRINA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is LEWIS, THOMAS TRENT. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0007

  • Filing Date:

    07/06/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

LEWIS, THOMAS TRENT

 

Party Details

Petitioner

CHILD WELFARE SERVICES

Respondent

CHEN IRINA

Not Classified By Court

LACEY JACKIE - District Attorney

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

LACEY JACQUELYN PHILLIPS

HANNAH AMBER

Respondent Attorneys

GLASS DAVID J

DAYAN RUTH

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

01/31/2019

DocketRequest - Dismissal (case previously dismissed on 10/29/2018 ); Filed by Petitioner

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/29/2018

Docketat 8:30 AM in Department 2, Lewis, Thomas Trent, Presiding; Habeas Corpus Hearing - Not Held - Case Dismissed

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/29/2018

DocketMinute Order

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/21/2018

Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 2, Lewis, Thomas Trent, Presiding; Habeas Corpus Hearing - Held - Continued

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/21/2018

DocketStipulation and Order (TO CONTINUE HEARING ); Filed by Petitioner

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/21/2018

DocketStipulation and Order (re CARE OF CHILD PENDING DECISION ON HAGUE APPLICATION ); Filed by Respondent

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/21/2018

DocketMinute Order

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/20/2018

DocketStipulation and Order (To Continue Hearing ); Filed by Petitioner

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/20/2018

DocketStipulation and Order; Filed by Respondent

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/15/2018

Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 2, Lewis, Thomas Trent, Presiding; Habeas Corpus Hearing - Held - Continued

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
7 More Docket Entries
08/13/2018

DocketRequest (for Live Testimony ); Filed by Respondent

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/09/2018

DocketStipulation and Order; Filed by Petitioner

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/07/2018

Docketat 8:30 AM in Department 2, Lewis, Thomas Trent, Presiding; Habeas Corpus Hearing - Held - Continued

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/07/2018

DocketMinute Order

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/06/2018

DocketMiscellaneous (Points and authorities in support of expedited proceedings under the Hague convention on the civil aspects of international child abduction ); Filed by Petitioner

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/06/2018

DocketWarrant - Issued (In lieu of writ of Habeas Corpus )

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/06/2018

DocketMemorandum - Points and Authorities (Memorandum of law: the convention on the civil aspects of international child abduction, done at the Hauge, Oct. 25, 1980; and the International Child Abduction remedies Act 42 USC 11601 ); Filed by Petitioner

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/06/2018

DocketNotice (of application for the return of minor children under the Hague Convention on the civil aspects of international child abduction ); Filed by Petitioner

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/06/2018

DocketPetition - Habeas Corpus - Family Law (For return of minor children to petitioner under the Hague Convention and Declaration of Rosa Alarcon ); Filed by Petitioner

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/06/2018

DocketPetition - Family Law Other (for a warrant in lieu of a writ of Habeas Corpus ); Filed by Petitioner

[+] Read More [-] Read Less