Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/19/2021 at 01:49:10 (UTC).

CHILD & MARTON LLP VS MARGARITO FRESCAS, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/18/2019 CHILD MARTON LLP filed an Other - Declaratory Judgment lawsuit against MARGARITO FRESCAS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5601

  • Filing Date:

    12/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Other - Declaratory Judgment

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CHILD & MARTON LLP

Defendants

SANTANA HECTOR

GARCIA MARILU

ARROYO LEE

HUERTA SONIA

FRESCAS MARGARITO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CHILD BRADFORD

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL READINESS CONFERENCE)

1/29/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL READINESS CONFERENCE)

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER AMENDED STIPULATION AND ORDER RE DISTRIBUTION OF FUNDS IN INTERPLEADER AND ORDER

2/22/2021: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER AMENDED STIPULATION AND ORDER RE DISTRIBUTION OF FUNDS IN INTERPLEADER AND ORDER

Request for Dismissal

2/26/2021: Request for Dismissal

Notice of Ruling

10/20/2020: Notice of Ruling

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER RE DISTRIBUTION OF FUNDS IN INTERPLEADER

11/13/2020: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER RE DISTRIBUTION OF FUNDS IN INTERPLEADER

Case Management Statement

9/22/2020: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE T...)

10/6/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE T...)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE DUE TO COVID-19 STATE OF EMERGENCY DECLARATIONS]

4/29/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE DUE TO COVID-19 STATE OF EMERGENCY DECLARATIONS]

Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

5/7/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Proof of Personal Service

1/24/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

1/31/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Personal Service

1/17/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

12/30/2019: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

12/30/2019: Notice of Case Management Conference

Complaint

12/18/2019: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/18/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

12/18/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

12/20/2019: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/17/2021
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 16; Trial Readiness Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Child & Marton LLP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketStipulation and Order (Amended Stipulation and Order re Distribution of Funds in Interpleader and Order); Filed by Child & Marton LLP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • Docketat 11:30 AM in Department 16; Non-Jury Trial (, T/E3 days,) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • Docketat 11:00 AM in Department 16; Trial Readiness Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Trial Readiness Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketStipulation and Order (re Distribution of Funds in Interpleader (Submitted 11-13-2020)); Filed by Child & Marton LLP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by Child & Marton LLP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 16; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 16; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Child & Marton LLP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Child & Marton LLP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Child & Marton LLP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Child & Marton LLP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Child & Marton LLP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Child & Marton LLP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Child & Marton LLP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CHILD & MARTON LLP is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CHILD BRADFORD T. ESQ.