This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/24/2023 at 05:06:21 (UTC).

CHICO, BRYLLE ELLIS VS CHICO, KIMBERLY ANGELICA

Case Summary

On 10/06/2022 CHICO, BRYLLE ELLIS filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against CHICO, KIMBERLY ANGELICA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SCULLY, ELIZABETH. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0978

  • Filing Date:

    10/06/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

SCULLY, ELIZABETH

 

Party Details

Petitioner

CHICO BRYLLE ELLIS

Respondent

CHICO KIMBERLY ANGELICA

 

Court Documents

Stipulation and Order

10/23/2023: Stipulation and Order

Order - Family-Centered Case Resolution Conference (FAM 112)

10/17/2023: Order - Family-Centered Case Resolution Conference (FAM 112)

Minute Order

10/17/2023: Minute Order

Notice - Change of Hearing/Trial FL 308 Agreement and Order to Reschedule Hearing

10/16/2023: Notice - Change of Hearing/Trial FL 308 Agreement and Order to Reschedule Hearing

Substitution of Attorney

8/29/2023: Substitution of Attorney

Declaration - Income and Expense FL 150 - Income and Expense

8/17/2023: Declaration - Income and Expense FL 150 - Income and Expense

Proof of Service - Mail

7/25/2023: Proof of Service - Mail

Minute Order

7/11/2023: Minute Order

Proof of Service - Mail

7/7/2023: Proof of Service - Mail

Request - Continue Hearing REQUEST - CONTINUE HEARING (FL306)

7/7/2023: Request - Continue Hearing REQUEST - CONTINUE HEARING (FL306)

Fee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003

4/26/2023: Fee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003

RFO/MTN - Child Support Other: Order Retroactive to Filing and Payment

4/26/2023: RFO/MTN - Child Support Other: Order Retroactive to Filing and Payment

Order - Family-Centered Case Resolution Conference (FAM 112)

4/26/2023: Order - Family-Centered Case Resolution Conference (FAM 112)

Minute Order

4/25/2023: Minute Order

Responsive Declaration

4/10/2023: Responsive Declaration

Declaration - Income and Expense

3/22/2023: Declaration - Income and Expense

Declaration - Community and Quasi-Community Property

3/22/2023: Declaration - Community and Quasi-Community Property

Substitution of Attorney

3/6/2023: Substitution of Attorney

31 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

10/23/2023

DocketStipulation and Order

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/17/2023

Docketat 8:30 AM in Department 27, Scully, Elizabeth, Presiding; RFO - Child Support - Off Calendar - No Appearance

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/17/2023

DocketOrder - Family-Centered Case Resolution Conference (FAM 112)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/17/2023

DocketMinute Order

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/16/2023

DocketNotice - Change of Hearing/Trial (FL 308 Agreement and Order to Reschedule Hearing ); Filed by Respondent

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/29/2023

DocketSubstitution of Attorney (Substitution of Attorney ); Filed by Petitioner

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/17/2023

DocketDeclaration - Income and Expense (FL 150 - Income and Expense ); Filed by Respondent

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/25/2023

DocketProof of Service - Mail; Filed by Respondent

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/11/2023

Docketat 8:30 AM in Department 27, Scully, Elizabeth, Presiding; RFO - Child Support - Held - Continued

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/11/2023

DocketMinute Order

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
31 More Docket Entries
11/30/2022

DocketFee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003; Filed by Respondent

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/30/2022

DocketResponse - Dissolution, Nullity, Legal Separation; Filed by Respondent

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/30/2022

DocketDeclaration - UCCJEA; Filed by Respondent

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/30/2022

DocketDeclaration - Income and Expense; Filed by Respondent

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/16/2022

DocketSubstitution of Attorney (Substitution of Attorney ); Filed by Petitioner

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/07/2022

DocketOrder - Financial Information (FAM 111)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/06/2022

DocketSummons (Summons ); Filed by Petitioner

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/06/2022

DocketPetition - Dissolution w/ Minor Child (Petition - Dissolution w/ Minor Child ); Filed by Petitioner

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/06/2022

DocketDeclaration - UCCJEA (Declaration - UCCJEA ); Filed by Petitioner

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/06/2022

DocketFamily Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020 (Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020 ); Filed by Petitioner

[+] Read More [-] Read Less