Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/14/2020 at 03:25:25 (UTC).

CHICAGO TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY, A FLORIDA CORPORATION VS TUFELD CORPORATION, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 07/10/2020 CHICAGO TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY, A FLORIDA CORPORATION filed an Other - Declaratory Judgment lawsuit against TUFELD CORPORATION, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DENNIS J. LANDIN. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5920

  • Filing Date:

    07/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Other - Declaratory Judgment

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

DENNIS J. LANDIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CHICAGO TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY A FLORIDA CORPORATION

Defendant

TUFELD CORPORATION A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HANNA ROBERT

Defendant Attorneys

GOLDMAN JAMES

MCKISSICK SEAN

 

Court Documents

Notice - NOTICE OF RULING RE RELATED CASES AND NOTICE OF SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

8/20/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF RULING RE RELATED CASES AND NOTICE OF SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

8/20/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Notice of Ruling - NOTICE OF RULING AT TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE IN RELATED CASE BC691352

8/21/2020: Notice of Ruling - NOTICE OF RULING AT TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE IN RELATED CASE BC691352

Notice - NOTICE OF FILING RESPONSE TO OBJECTIONS TO NOTICE OF RELATED CASE

8/13/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF FILING RESPONSE TO OBJECTIONS TO NOTICE OF RELATED CASE

Notice - NOTICE OF BEVERLY HILLS GATEWAY, L.P.S OBJECTION TO TUFELD CORPORATIONS NOTICE OF RELATED CASE

8/7/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF BEVERLY HILLS GATEWAY, L.P.S OBJECTION TO TUFELD CORPORATIONS NOTICE OF RELATED CASE

Joinder - JOINDER NOTICE OF JOINDER IN BEVERLY HILLS GATEWAY, L.P.'S OBJECTIONS TO TUFFLED CORPORATION'S NOTICE OF RELATED CASE

8/10/2020: Joinder - JOINDER NOTICE OF JOINDER IN BEVERLY HILLS GATEWAY, L.P.'S OBJECTIONS TO TUFFLED CORPORATION'S NOTICE OF RELATED CASE

Answer

7/28/2020: Answer

Notice of Related Case

7/29/2020: Notice of Related Case

Notice of Case Management Conference

7/16/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/10/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/10/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

7/10/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

7/10/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

7/10/2020: Complaint

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/10/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by CHICAGO TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY, a Florida corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • DocketNotice of Ruling (AT TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE IN RELATED CASE BC691352); Filed by TUFELD CORPORATION, a California corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 51, Dennis J. Landin, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • DocketNotice (of Ruling re Related Cases and Notice of Setting Case Management Conference); Filed by TUFELD CORPORATION, a California corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • DocketNotice (of Filing Response to Objections to Notice of Related Case); Filed by TUFELD CORPORATION, a California corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • DocketJoinder (NOTICE OF JOINDER IN BEVERLY HILLS GATEWAY, L.P.'S OBJECTIONS TO TUFFLED CORPORATION'S NOTICE OF RELATED CASE); Filed by CHICAGO TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY, a Florida corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • DocketNotice (OF BEVERLY HILLS GATEWAY, L.P.?S OBJECTION TO TUFELD CORPORATION?S NOTICE OF RELATED CASE); Filed by TUFELD CORPORATION, a California corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • DocketNotice of Related Case ((BC691352 is the lower case)); Filed by TUFELD CORPORATION, a California corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by TUFELD CORPORATION, a California corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by CHICAGO TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY, a Florida corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by CHICAGO TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY, a Florida corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by CHICAGO TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY, a Florida corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by CHICAGO TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY, a Florida corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TUFELD CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where CHICAGO TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GOLDMAN JAMES