This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/02/2023 at 06:31:43 (UTC).

CHIBUZO EZINNE VS PEOPLE'S CARE LOS ANGELES, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/20/2020 CHIBUZO EZINNE filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against PEOPLE'S CARE LOS ANGELES, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MEL RED RECANA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4659

  • Filing Date:

    11/20/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MEL RED RECANA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

EZINNE CHIBUZO

Defendants

THOMAS AN INDIVUDUAL JASMINE

PEOPLE'S CARE LOS ANGELES A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

TREZILLA AN INDIVIDUAL CHRISTOPHER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

HOERAUF GRAHAM M.

Other Attorneys

ANYANWU CHIMA A

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL...)

3/30/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL...)

Unknown - ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT PEOPLE'S CARE LOS ANGELES, LLC'S UNOPPOSED EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND ALL RELATED DEADLINES

3/30/2023: Unknown - ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT PEOPLE'S CARE LOS ANGELES, LLC'S UNOPPOSED EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND ALL RELATED DEADLINES

Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application

3/28/2023: Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION DEFENDANT PEOPLES CARE LOS ANGELES, LLC UNOPPOSED EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL AND ALL RELATED DEADLINES; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUT

3/28/2023: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION DEFENDANT PEOPLES CARE LOS ANGELES, LLC UNOPPOSED EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL AND ALL RELATED DEADLINES; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUT

Substitution of Attorney

1/26/2023: Substitution of Attorney

Notice - NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY OF PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL

11/4/2022: Notice - NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY OF PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

10/19/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 10/19/2021

10/19/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 10/19/2021

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

10/19/2021: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

10/21/2021: Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

12/8/2021: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 12/08/2021

12/8/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 12/08/2021

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

12/8/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

12/8/2021: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (2ND)

1/25/2022: Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (2ND)

Answer

3/4/2022: Answer

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

9/29/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) OF 09/29/2021

9/29/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) OF 09/29/2021

27 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/15/2024
  • Hearing04/15/2024 at 09:00 AM in Department 45 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2024
  • Hearing04/03/2024 at 09:00 AM in Department 45 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Mandatory Settlement Conference (MSC)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2024
  • Hearing04/03/2024 at 09:00 AM in Department 45 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Defendant Peoples Care Los Angeles, LLC Unopposed Ex Parte Application for an Order Continuing Trial and All Related Deadlines: Filed By: People's Care Los Angeles, a California Limited Liability Company (Defendant); Result: Granted ; Result Date: 03/30/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2023
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 04/03/2024 at 09:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 45

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2023
  • DocketMandatory Settlement Conference (MSC) scheduled for 04/03/2024 at 09:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 45

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2023
  • DocketJury Trial scheduled for 04/15/2024 at 09:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 45

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2023
  • DocketOrder Granting Defendant People's Care Los Angeles, LLC's Unopposed Ex Parte Application to Continue Trial and All Related Deadlines; Filed by: People's Care Los Angeles, a California Limited Liability Company (Defendant); As to: Chibuzo Ezinne (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Hearing on Ex Parte Application For an Order Continuing Trial...)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2023
  • DocketHearing on Ex Parte Application For an Order Continuing Trial and All Related Deadlines scheduled for 03/30/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 45 updated: Result Date to 03/30/2023; Result Type to Held - Motion Granted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
47 More Docket Entries
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Chibuzo Ezinne (Plaintiff); As to: Christopher Treilla, an individual (Defendant); Service Date: 03/12/2021; Service Cost: 60.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: People's Care Los Angeles, a California Limited Liability Company (Defendant); As to: Chibuzo Ezinne (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • DocketNotice: Waiver of Court Fees (Superior Court); Filed by: Clerk; As to: Chibuzo Ezinne (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 05/17/2021 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 45

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Chibuzo Ezinne (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Chibuzo Ezinne (Plaintiff); As to: People's Care Los Angeles, a California Limited Liability Company (Defendant); Jasmine Thomas, an indivudual (Defendant); Christopher Treilla, an individual (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Chibuzo Ezinne (Plaintiff); As to: People's Care Los Angeles, a California Limited Liability Company (Defendant); Jasmine Thomas, an indivudual (Defendant); Christopher Treilla, an individual (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Mel Red Recana in Department 45 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less