Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/15/2019 at 14:15:27 (UTC).

CHIANG, HSIANG WEI VS CHANG, EUGENE HOU CHEN

Case Summary

On 12/20/2017 CHIANG, HSIANG WEI filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against CHANG, EUGENE HOU CHEN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pomona Courthouse South located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1508

  • Filing Date:

    12/20/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pomona Courthouse South

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

CHIANG HSIANG WEI

Respondent

CHANG EUGENE HOU CHEN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

QI STEVE QI

Respondent Attorney

YANG WEN WINNY

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/18/2019
  • Notice - Case Review Re: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2018
  • Notice - Change of Address; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2018
  • Response - Dissolution, Nullity, Legal Separation; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2018
  • Proof of Service of Summons; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2018
  • Proof of Service of Summons; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • Petition - Dissolution w/o Minor Child; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • Summons; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less