This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/27/2020 at 01:14:32 (UTC).

CHI YIN, ET AL. VS GRACE M. YIN, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/03/2018 CHI YIN filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against GRACE M YIN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pomona Courthouse South located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is PETER A. HERNANDEZ. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0208

  • Filing Date:

    12/03/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

PETER A. HERNANDEZ

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

YIN TAMMY P.

YIN CHI

YIN HSIU-YUN

YIN JANICE

ANY AND ALL OTHER PERSONS UNKNOWN CLAIMING ANY LEGAL OR EQUITABLE RIGHT TITEL ESTATE LIEN OR INTEREST IN THE PEROPERTY DESCRIBED IN THE COMPLAINT ADVERSE TO CROSS-COMPLAINANTS' TITLE OR ANY CLOUD ON CROSS-COMPLAINANTS' TITLE THERETO

YIN JANE

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

YIN GRACE M.

YIN PHIL LIH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

THOMAS STEPHEN

Defendant Attorney

CUEVAS JAIME ALBERTO

 

Court Documents

Notice of Settlement

2/13/2020: Notice of Settlement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE;)

2/13/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE;)

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

5/15/2019: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE T...)

5/20/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE T...)

Case Management Statement

5/8/2019: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

5/3/2019: Case Management Statement

Answer

4/26/2019: Answer

Cross-Complaint

3/28/2019: Cross-Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

3/28/2019: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Answer

1/25/2019: Answer

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

12/27/2018: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Summons - Summons on Complaint

12/3/2018: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/3/2018: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

12/3/2018: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

12/3/2018: Complaint

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/22/2020
  • Hearing05/22/2020 at 08:30 AM in Department O at 400 Civic Center Plaza, Pomona, CA 91766; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department O, Peter A. Hernandez, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department O, Peter A. Hernandez, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by Chi Yin (Plaintiff); Tammy P. Yin (Plaintiff); Janice Yin (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Final Status Conference;)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department O, Peter A. Hernandez, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department O, Peter A. Hernandez, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure t...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Chi Yin (Plaintiff); Tammy P. Yin (Plaintiff); Janice Yin (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Grace M. Yin (Defendant); Phil Lih Yin (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 03/28/2019
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by Grace M. Yin (Cross-Complainant); Phil Lih Yin (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Grace M. Yin (Defendant); Phil Lih Yin (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Chi Yin (Plaintiff); Tammy P. Yin (Plaintiff); Janice Yin (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Chi Yin (Plaintiff); Tammy P. Yin (Plaintiff); Janice Yin (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Chi Yin (Plaintiff); Tammy P. Yin (Plaintiff); Janice Yin (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Chi Yin (Plaintiff); Tammy P. Yin (Plaintiff); Janice Yin (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Chi Yin (Plaintiff); Tammy P. Yin (Plaintiff); Janice Yin (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer THOMAS STEPHEN