This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/01/2019 at 08:36:18 (UTC).

CHI DINH TRAN VS DAWN WHITE O'CONNOR

Case Summary

On 01/31/2019 CHI DINH TRAN filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against DAWN WHITE O'CONNOR. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is LAURA A. SEIGLE. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3257

  • Filing Date:

    01/31/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

LAURA A. SEIGLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TRAN CHI DINH

Defendant

O'CONNOR DAWN WHITE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

FOSS JOHN BLAKE

DUNHAM DONALD TILDON

 

Court Documents

Complaint

1/31/2019: Complaint

Summons

1/31/2019: Summons

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

1/31/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/31/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/31/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Certificate of Mailing for

2/5/2019: Certificate of Mailing for

Other -

2/5/2019: Other -

Notice of Settlement

5/22/2019: Notice of Settlement

Certificate of Mailing for

5/22/2019: Certificate of Mailing for

Minute Order

5/22/2019: Minute Order

Minute Order

8/30/2019: Minute Order

Order - Dismissal

8/30/2019: Order - Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/30/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 4B, Laura A. Seigle, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement))); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • DocketOrder - Dismissal; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • Docketat 10:45 AM in Department 4B, Laura A. Seigle, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order re Notice of Settlement of Entire Case)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Court Order re Notice of Settlement of Entire Case) of 05/22/2019); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by Chi Dinh Tran (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates] and Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • DocketStanding Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Chi Dinh Tran (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Chi Dinh Tran (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Chi Dinh Tran (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Chi Dinh Tran (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer FOSS JOHN B

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DUNHAM DONALD TILDON