Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/07/2019 at 10:59:47 (UTC).

CHEYANNE CLUNEY VS SOROUR DMD PC

Case Summary

On 03/10/2017 CHEYANNE CLUNEY filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against SOROUR DMD PC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JON R. TAKASUGI. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2583

  • Filing Date:

    03/10/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JON R. TAKASUGI

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

CLUNEY CHEYANNE

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1-10

SOROUR DMD PC

SOROUR SELVANA D.M.D.

SOROUR THARWAT D.M.D.

PC SOROUR DMD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

WASSERMAN MICHAEL E. ESQ.

WASSERMAN MICHAEL ERIC ESQ.

 

Court Documents

PLAINTIFF CHEYANNE CLUNEYS EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND ALL CORRESPONDING DATES;DECLARATION OF MICHAEL E.WASSERMAN IN SUPPORT THEREOF

8/22/2018: PLAINTIFF CHEYANNE CLUNEYS EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND ALL CORRESPONDING DATES;DECLARATION OF MICHAEL E.WASSERMAN IN SUPPORT THEREOF

Minute Order

8/22/2018: Minute Order

Minute Order

8/24/2018: Minute Order

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

8/27/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

8/27/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

8/27/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

Minute Order

9/10/2018: Minute Order

Statement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death)

10/16/2018: Statement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death)

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

10/16/2018: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Statement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death)

10/16/2018: Statement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death)

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

10/16/2018: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

10/16/2018: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Statement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death)

10/16/2018: Statement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death)

Minute Order

10/24/2018: Minute Order

Minute Order

2/7/2019: Minute Order

Minute Order

5/9/2019: Minute Order

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/09/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 3, Jon R. Takasugi, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (for Failure to Enter Default Judgment) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal for Failure to Enter Defaul...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 3, Jon R. Takasugi, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (For Failure of Plaintiff to Enter Default/Default Judgment) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal For Failure of Plaintiff to...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 3, Jon R. Takasugi, Presiding; Trial Setting Conference - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2018
  • Minute order entered: 2018-10-24 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2018
  • Minute Order ((Trial Setting Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • Statement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death); Filed by Cheyanne Cluney (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • Statement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death); Filed by Cheyanne Cluney (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • Statement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death); Filed by Cheyanne Cluney (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 08/24/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • Minute order entered: 2018-08-24 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 3; Ex-Parte Proceedings (Exparte proceeding; Denied) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • Ex-Parte Application; Filed by Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • PLAINTIFF CHEYANNE CLUNEYS EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND ALL CORRESPONDING DATES;DECLARATION OF MICHAEL E.WASSERMAN IN SUPPORT THEREOF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • Minute order entered: 2018-08-22 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by Cheyanne Cluney (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2017
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2017
  • Summons; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC652583    Hearing Date: February 09, 2021    Dept: 31

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES - CENTRAL DISTRICT

CHEYENNE CLUNEY,

Plaintiff(s),

vs.

SOROUR DMD PC, ET AL.,

Defendant(s).

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

Case No.: BC652583

ORDER CONDITIONALLY GRANTING REQUEST FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT

Dept. 31

Plaintiff, Cheyanne Cluney filed this action against Defendants, Sorour DMD PC, Selvana Sorour, DMD, and Tharwat Sorout, DMD for dental malpractice. Plaintiff filed the action on 3/10/17. She filed proof of service of the summons, complaint, statement of damages, and related documents on each of the three defendants on 8/27/18; the POS shows each of the defendants was served by substitute service at his/her/its place of business, All Kids Dental & Braces. On 10/16/18, at Plaintiff’s request, the Clerk entered Defendants’ defaults.

At this time, Plaintiff seeks entry of default against Defendants. The request was previously denied without prejudice for two reasons.

(Min. Order 11/2/20.)

On 2/2/21, Plaintiff submitted documents curing the defects discussed in the prior ruling. However, the court has one minor concern regarding the proposed judgment filed by Plaintiff on 2/2/21. Plaintiff is properly not requesting prejudgment interest in this matter; however, although it is not checked, the proposed judgment includes a request for $6,000 a next to prejudgment interest box at item 6.a.(2). This appears to be a mistake as Plaintiff is requesting $81,000 total as damages based on $75,000 for general damages and $6,000 for special damages. Plaintiff should provide the total amount of damages in item 6.a.(1). Plaintiff is orderd to provide an amended proposed judgment with the correct amount of damages in item 6.a.(1), and the court will enter judgment upon receipt of the same.

Dated this ___ day of February, 2021

Hon. Thomas D. Long

Judge of the Superior Court