This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/14/2019 at 00:45:25 (UTC).

CHET LOVEGREN VS AMBER MEYER

Case Summary

On 05/09/2018 a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle case was filed by CHET LOVEGREN against AMBER MEYER in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5779

  • Filing Date:

    05/09/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JON R. TAKASUGI

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

LOVEGREN CHET

Defendants and Respondents

MEYER AMBER

DOES 1 TO 25

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

SHEMTOUB MICHAEL

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (JURY TRIAL)

11/12/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (JURY TRIAL)

Order - Dismissal

11/12/2019: Order - Dismissal

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (JURY TRIAL) OF 11/12/2019

11/12/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (JURY TRIAL) OF 11/12/2019

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

10/23/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

4/2/2019: Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

4/2/2019: Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

5/2/2019: Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL)

5/2/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL)

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER -

5/11/2018: ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER -

COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES) -

5/9/2018: COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES) -

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/12/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 3, Jon R. Takasugi, Presiding; Jury Trial - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Jury Trial) of 11/12/2019); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • DocketOrder - Dismissal; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Jury Trial)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 3, Jon R. Takasugi, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Final Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 3, Jon R. Takasugi, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • DocketOrder Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil; Filed by Chet Lovegren (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • DocketDeclaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil; Filed by Chet Lovegren (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • DocketMotion to Be Relieved as Counsel; Filed by Chet Lovegren (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2018
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2018
  • DocketORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2018
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees; Filed by Chet Lovegren (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Chet Lovegren (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC705779    Hearing Date: December 26, 2019    Dept: 3

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES - CENTRAL DISTRICT

CHET LOVEGREN,

Plaintiff(s),

vs.

AMBER MEYER, ET AL.,

Defendant(s).

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

Case No.: BC705779

[TENTATIVE] ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO VACATE DISMISSAL

Dept. 3

1:30 p.m.

December 26, 2019

Plaintiff, Chet Lovegren filed this action against Defendant, Amber Meyer for damages arising out of an automobile accident. Plaintiff filed the complaint on 5/09/18. Plaintiff has not, to date, filed proof of service of the summons and complaint on Defendant. On 5/02/19, the Court granted Plaintiff’s attorney’s motion to be relieved as counsel. The Court ordered relief effective upon filing proof of service of the final order on Plaintiff. To date, Counsel has not filed proof of service of the final order, such that relief is not yet effective.

Plaintiff failed to appear at the 10/23/19 FSC or the 11/12/19 trial. On 11/12/19, the Court dismissed the case.

At this time, Plaintiff moves to set aside the dismissal. Plaintiff’s attorney declares the failure to appear at the FSC and trial was due to a calendaring error in his office. Specifically, he explains that the attorney who was supposed to serve the order relieving the office from representing Plaintiff left the firm, so the office had vacated the FSC and trial dates, but the order was never served on Plaintiff. Thus, the failure to appear at the FSC and trial was the result of attorney mistake or neglect. The motion is granted. CCP §473(b).

The Court sets an OSC re: proof of service and trial setting conference for Wednesday, 2/26/20 at 8:30 a.m. in Department 3 of the Spring Street Courthouse.

Parties who intend to submit on this tentative must send an email to the court at sscdept3@lacourt.org indicating intention to submit on the tentative as directed by the instructions provided on the court website at www.lacourt.org.  If the department does not receive an email indicating the parties are submitting on the tentative and there are no appearances at the hearing, the motion may be placed off calendar. If a party submits on the tentative, the party’s email must include the case number and must identify the party submitting on the tentative.