This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/18/2022 at 02:57:00 (UTC).

CHERYL NESTLERODE VS CITY OF TORRANCE, A GOVERNMENTAL ENTITY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/18/2019 CHERYL NESTLERODE filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against CITY OF TORRANCE, A GOVERNMENTAL ENTITY,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are HOLLY E. KENDIG and AUDRA MORI. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1366

  • Filing Date:

    11/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

HOLLY E. KENDIG

AUDRA MORI

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NESTLERODE CHERYL

Defendants

BENVENISTE JESSICA AN INDIVIDUAL

TORRANCE UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT A PUBLIC ENTITY

CITY OF TORRANCE A GOVERNMENTAL ENTITY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CURRAN ALICIA SARAH

Defendant Attorneys

THOMPSON-BELL DELLA

MOTT JONATHAN JUDD

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

9/14/2021: Request for Dismissal

Notice - NOTICE OF PLACING MSJ OR MSA OFF CALENDAR

8/24/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF PLACING MSJ OR MSA OFF CALENDAR

Notice of Settlement

8/24/2021: Notice of Settlement

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 09/01/2021

9/1/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 09/01/2021

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

9/1/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

8/2/2021: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Motion for Summary Judgment

7/2/2021: Motion for Summary Judgment

Declaration - DECLARATION EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

7/2/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

Separate Statement

7/2/2021: Separate Statement

Request for Refund / Order

5/10/2021: Request for Refund / Order

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

11/19/2020: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

3/1/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

3/1/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Declaration of Mailing

3/1/2021: Declaration of Mailing

[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

3/17/2021: [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [[PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSONAL INJURY COURTS ONLY (CENTRAL DISTRICT)]

3/17/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [[PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSONAL INJURY COURTS ONLY (CENTRAL DISTRICT)]

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT AND CONTINUE TRIAL DATE; [PROPOSED] ORDER

3/17/2021: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT AND CONTINUE TRIAL DATE; [PROPOSED] ORDER

Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER ON STIPULATION TO CONTINUE THE TRIAL, FSC AND RELATED CUT OFF DATES

3/19/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER ON STIPULATION TO CONTINUE THE TRIAL, FSC AND RELATED CUT OFF DATES

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/30/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 31, Audra Mori, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (Dismissal after Settlement) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 31, Audra Mori, Presiding; Non-Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 31, Audra Mori, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 31, Audra Mori, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Cheryl Nestlerode (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 31, Audra Mori, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • Docketat 09:02 AM in Department 31, Audra Mori, Presiding; Court Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 09/01/2021); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by Cheryl Nestlerode (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
23 More Docket Entries
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketDeclaration (of Della Thompson-Bell in Support of Demurrer to Plaintiff's Complaint); Filed by City of Torrance, a governmental entity (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketDemurrer - without Motion to Strike; Filed by City of Torrance, a governmental entity (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Cheryl Nestlerode (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Cheryl Nestlerode (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Cheryl Nestlerode (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Cheryl Nestlerode (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Cheryl Nestlerode (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: *******1366    Hearing Date: March 03, 2020    Dept: 31

Moot, case dismissed.


related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TORRANCE UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT is a litigant

Latest cases where CITY OF TORRANCE is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CURRAN, ALICIA S