This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/07/2021 at 10:31:26 (UTC).

CHERYL LEE VS CITY OF LONG BEACH

Case Summary

On 03/25/2021 CHERYL LEE filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against CITY OF LONG BEACH. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1611

  • Filing Date:

    03/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LEE CHERYL

Defendant

LONG BEACH CITY OF

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROSEN STEPHEN N.

Defendant Attorney

VIGUS TODD

 

Court Documents

Notice of Change of Firm Name

6/11/2021: Notice of Change of Firm Name

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

4/6/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

PI General Order

4/6/2021: PI General Order

Proof of Personal Service

4/21/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Answer

5/17/2021: Answer

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/25/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

3/25/2021: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/25/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

3/25/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

3/26/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/21/2024
  • Hearing03/21/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • Hearing09/22/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • Hearing09/08/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketNotice of Change of Firm Name; Filed by Cheryl Lee (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by City of Long Beach (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Cheryl Lee (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Date); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Cheryl Lee (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Cheryl Lee (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Cheryl Lee (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Cheryl Lee (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LONG BEACH CITY OF is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer VIGUS TODD