This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/22/2023 at 10:56:29 (UTC).

CHERYL KATHLEEN REED VS LYFT, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 02/17/2023 CHERYL KATHLEEN REED filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against LYFT, INC ,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3646

  • Filing Date:

    02/17/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

REED CHERYL KATHLEEN

Defendants

ESCAMILLA FELIPE PEDRO

LYFT INC.

PEREZ GUADALUPE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ESFEH DAVID M.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

2/17/2023: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/17/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

2/17/2023: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Unknown - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL PERSONAL INJURY CASE

2/17/2023: Unknown - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL PERSONAL INJURY CASE

Unknown - EIGHTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR PROCEDURES IN THE PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURTS

2/17/2023: Unknown - EIGHTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR PROCEDURES IN THE PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURTS

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

2/17/2023: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

2/17/2023: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Proof of Personal Service

3/2/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Request for Dismissal

4/11/2023: Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal

4/25/2023: Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/14/2025
  • Hearing02/14/2025 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2024
  • Hearing08/16/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2024
  • Hearing08/02/2024 at 10:00 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2023
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by CHERYL KATHLEEN REED on 02/17/2023, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by CHERYL KATHLEEN REED as to GUADALUPE PEREZ

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2023
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: CHERYL KATHLEEN REED (Plaintiff); As to: LYFT, INC. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2023
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by CHERYL KATHLEEN REED on 02/17/2023, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by CHERYL KATHLEEN REED as to LYFT, INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2023
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: CHERYL KATHLEEN REED (Plaintiff); As to: LYFT, INC. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: CHERYL KATHLEEN REED (Plaintiff); As to: LYFT, INC. (Defendant); Service Date: 03/02/2023; Service Cost: 97.70; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 02/14/2025 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 32

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Michael E. Whitaker in Department 32 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 08/02/2024 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 32

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 08/16/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 32

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2023
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: CHERYL KATHLEEN REED (Plaintiff); As to: LYFT, INC. (Defendant); GUADALUPE PEREZ (Defendant); FELIPE PEDRO ESCAMILLA (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2023
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: CHERYL KATHLEEN REED (Plaintiff); As to: LYFT, INC. (Defendant); GUADALUPE PEREZ (Defendant); FELIPE PEDRO ESCAMILLA (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: CHERYL KATHLEEN REED (Plaintiff); As to: LYFT, INC. (Defendant); GUADALUPE PEREZ (Defendant); FELIPE PEDRO ESCAMILLA (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2023
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2023
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2023
  • DocketEighth Amended Standing Order for Procedures in the Personal Injury Hub Courts; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Personal Injury Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less