This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/24/2021 at 17:33:39 (UTC).

CHERYL JUAREZ VS SAM'S WEST, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 08/11/2021 CHERYL JUAREZ filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against SAM'S WEST, INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9637

  • Filing Date:

    08/11/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JUAREZ CHERYL

Defendants

RUIZ STORE MANAGER MICHAEL

SAM'S WEST INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PANAH SETAREH

 

Court Documents

Complaint

8/11/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

8/11/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/11/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

8/11/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/07/2024
  • Hearing08/07/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2023
  • Hearing02/08/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • Hearing01/25/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Cheryl Juarez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Cheryl Juarez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Cheryl Juarez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Sam's West, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PANAH SETAREH ESQ