This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/07/2019 at 10:47:08 (UTC).

CHERYL HARPER VS LOS ANGELES COUNTY METROPOLITAN

Case Summary

On 03/10/2017 CHERYL HARPER filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against LOS ANGELES COUNTY METROPOLITAN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is GEORGINA T. RIZK. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2549

  • Filing Date:

    03/10/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

GEORGINA T. RIZK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HARPER CHERYL

Defendant

LOS ANGELES COUNTY METROPOLITAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

AZIZZADEH SHAWN

Defendant Attorney

GRAVES & KING LAW OFFICES OF

 

Court Documents

Notice of Ruling

2/22/2019: Notice of Ruling

Minute Order

2/22/2019: Minute Order

Unknown

2/22/2019: Unknown

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

1/31/2019: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Motion to Continue Trial Date

1/28/2019: Motion to Continue Trial Date

Stipulation to Continue Trial/FSC [and Related Motion/Discovery Dates] Personal Injury Courts Only (Department 91, 92, 93, 97)

12/13/2018: Stipulation to Continue Trial/FSC [and Related Motion/Discovery Dates] Personal Injury Courts Only (Department 91, 92, 93, 97)

ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC [AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES] PERSONAL INJURY COURTS ONLY (CENTRAL DISTRICT)

7/19/2018: ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC [AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES] PERSONAL INJURY COURTS ONLY (CENTRAL DISTRICT)

Unknown

3/9/2018: Unknown

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

8/24/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

LOS ANGELES COUNTY METROPOLITAN TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY'S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

6/16/2017: LOS ANGELES COUNTY METROPOLITAN TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY'S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/22/2019
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 2, Georgina T. Rizk, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Continue Trial - Held - Motion Granted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by Los Angeles County Metropolitan (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Continue Trial) of 02/22/2019); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Continue Trial)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Los Angeles County Metropolitan (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 2, Georgina T. Rizk, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • DocketNotice of Motion and Motion to Continue Trial; Filed by Los Angeles County Metropolitan (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 2, Georgina T. Rizk, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • Docket[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Personal Injury Courts Only (Central District); Filed by Los Angeles County Metropolitan (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2018
  • DocketORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC [AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES] PERSONAL INJURY COURTS ONLY (CENTRAL DISTRICT)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 03/09/2018
  • DocketCIVIL DEPOSIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2018
  • DocketReceipt; Filed by Cheryl Harper (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2017
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2017
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Cheryl Harper (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2017
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Los Angeles County Metropolitan (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2017
  • DocketLOS ANGELES COUNTY METROPOLITAN TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY'S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2017
  • DocketRevised Summons

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2017
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Cheryl Harper (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2017
  • DocketComplaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Cheryl Harper (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: ****2549    Hearing Date: January 30, 2020    Dept: 29

Harper v. Los Angeles County Metropolitan

Motion to Continue Trial filed by the Defendant is GRANTED IN PART. The trial is continued to April 28, 2020 at 8:30 in Department 29. The final status conference is continued to April 17, 2020 at 10:00 a.m.

The trial date is firm. The parties are ordered to inform their witnesses, including expert witnesses, of the new trial date immediately. No further continuances should be expected.

The parties must diligently prepare for trial, including completion of expert discovery, even if the parties are hopeful the case will settle.

Good cause has not been shown for a continuance to October 2020. Defendant claims that a continuance to October is necessary to complete outstanding discovery. Good cause is shown when a party shows an “excused inability to obtain essential testimony, documents, or other material evidence despite diligent efforts.” California Rule of Court Rule 3.1332. This case is almost three years old. Defendant has not shown an “excused inability” to obtain the purportedly required discovery and has not provided any evidence that it has acted diligently during the three years that this case has been pending.

Moving party is ordered to give notice.