This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/25/2020 at 07:12:50 (UTC).

CHERYL CONHAIM VS LAURA FLEMING-HIZAMI ET AL

Case Summary

On 10/24/2017 CHERYL CONHAIM filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against LAURA FLEMING-HIZAMI. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are HOLLY E. KENDIG and ELAINE LU. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0735

  • Filing Date:

    10/24/2017

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

HOLLY E. KENDIG

ELAINE LU

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

CONHAIM CHERYL

Defendants and Respondents

FLEMING-HIZAMI LAURA

FLEMING BONNIE

DOES 1 TO 10

HIZAMI DANNY

Not Classified By Court

ROB SASLOW CLPF NCG ADMINISTRATOR OF THE ESTATE OF CHERYL CONHAIM

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

LEHAT STEVEN B.

RANDY GODIN

LEHAT STEVEN BRUCE

COLEMAN JEFFREY

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

LISNOW ROBERT A. A PROFESSIONAL CORP

LISNOW ROBERT ALLEN

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE; HEARING ON MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS ...)

11/19/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE; HEARING ON MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS ...)

Notice - NOTICE OF TAKING MOTION OFF CALENDAR

1/24/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF TAKING MOTION OFF CALENDAR

Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

9/5/2019: Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

Disassociation of Attorney

9/16/2019: Disassociation of Attorney

Order - ORDER RE: MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL

10/4/2019: Order - ORDER RE: MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: WHY THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT SHOUL...)

11/1/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: WHY THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT SHOUL...)

SUMMONS CROSS-COMPLAINT

4/30/2018: SUMMONS CROSS-COMPLAINT

REPLY TO OPPOSITION ON MOTION FOR A STAY

8/27/2018: REPLY TO OPPOSITION ON MOTION FOR A STAY

Minute Order -

3/15/2018: Minute Order -

ANSWER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR ENFORCEMENT OF SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT BY DEFENDANTS LAURA FLENUNG-HIZAMI AND DANNY HIZAMI (DEMAND FOR A JURY TRIAL)

4/30/2018: ANSWER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR ENFORCEMENT OF SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT BY DEFENDANTS LAURA FLENUNG-HIZAMI AND DANNY HIZAMI (DEMAND FOR A JURY TRIAL)

COMPENDIUM OF EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF CHERYL CONHAIM?S MOTION FOR ORDER TO STAY PROCEEDINGS WITH INDEX OF EXHIBITS

8/2/2018: COMPENDIUM OF EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF CHERYL CONHAIM?S MOTION FOR ORDER TO STAY PROCEEDINGS WITH INDEX OF EXHIBITS

Minute Order -

8/8/2018: Minute Order -

EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE HEARING DATE OF AUGUST 15, 2018, OR FOR MOTION TO SHORTEN TIME CRC 3.1201.

8/8/2018: EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE HEARING DATE OF AUGUST 15, 2018, OR FOR MOTION TO SHORTEN TIME CRC 3.1201.

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF GENERAL DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF CHERYL CONHAIM'S COMPLAINT BY DEFENDANTS LAURA FLEMING-HIZAMI

12/4/2017: REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF GENERAL DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF CHERYL CONHAIM'S COMPLAINT BY DEFENDANTS LAURA FLEMING-HIZAMI

GENERAL DEMURRER AND NOTICE OF HEARING ON GENERAL DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF CHERYL CONHAIM'S COMPLAINT BY DEFENDANTS LAURA FLEMING-HIZAMI; DANNY HARAMI; AND BONNIE FLEMING; INDEX OF EXHIBITS; ETC.

12/4/2017: GENERAL DEMURRER AND NOTICE OF HEARING ON GENERAL DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF CHERYL CONHAIM'S COMPLAINT BY DEFENDANTS LAURA FLEMING-HIZAMI; DANNY HARAMI; AND BONNIE FLEMING; INDEX OF EXHIBITS; ETC.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

11/7/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

COMPLAINT FOR ENFORCEMENT OF SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT AND FOR INJUNCTVE RELWF

10/24/2017: COMPLAINT FOR ENFORCEMENT OF SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT AND FOR INJUNCTVE RELWF

46 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/23/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 26, Elaine Lu, Presiding; Trial Setting Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Cheryl Conhaim (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 26, Elaine Lu, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 26, Elaine Lu, Presiding; Jury Trial ((5 day estimate)) - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 26, Elaine Lu, Presiding; Hearing on Motion - Other (MOTION BY THE ADMINISTRATOR OF THE ESTATE OF CHERYL CONHAIM, DECEASED, TO SUBSTITUTE INTO THE ACTION) - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 26, Elaine Lu, Presiding; Hearing on Motion - Other (MOTION BY THE ADMINISTRATOR OF THE ESTATE OF CHERYL CONHAIM, DECEASED, TO SUBSTITUTE INTO THE ACTION) - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • Docketat 09:10 AM in Department 26, Elaine Lu, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 04/01/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 26, Elaine Lu, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (why the motion filed 10/29/19 to substitute as Plaintiff's successor in interest should not be deemed moot and why the 4/7/20 hearing should not be taken off calendar) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
93 More Docket Entries
  • 11/17/2017
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2017
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Cheryl Conhaim (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2017
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2017
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Cheryl Conhaim (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2017
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2017
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE & OSC RE PROOF OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2017
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR ENFORCEMENT OF SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT AND FOR INJUNCTVE RELWF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Cheryl Conhaim (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC680735    Hearing Date: November 01, 2019    Dept: 26

Plaintiff counsel, Steven B Lehat (“Counsel”) moves to be relieved as counsel for Plaintiffs Cheryl Conhaim and her heirs and successors (“Client”). The Court heard Counsel’s motion on October 4, 2019. The Court continued the motion to November 1, 2019, to allow Counsel, if Counsel is also moving to withdraw as counsel of record for Cheryl Conhaim in her capacity as Cross-Defendant, to file amended forms MC-051, MC-052, and MC-053 by October 18, 2019, to make clear that Counsel is seeking to withdraw as counsel for Cheryl Conhaim both in her capacity as Plaintiff and also in her capacity as Cross-Defendant. (Minute Order, 10/04/19.) The Court ordered Counsel to file and serve, no later than October 18, 2019, a supplemental declaration setting forth all efforts to identify and serve Plaintiff’s heirs and representatives of the estate with notice of this order. (Minute Order, 10/04/19.)

Counsel has timely filed amended forms MC-051, MC-052, and MC-053 identifying his withdrawal as counsel for Client as plaintiff and cross-defendant. Counsel’s amended declaration states: “Client cannot be served; she is deceased; counsel has notified all parties known to have any interest in the estate and has informed them.” Attached to the declaration are proofs of service of the amended forms and notice of ruling to various persons. It is unclear whether these persons are those identified by Counsel to have an interest in the estate. The Court also notes that a proof of service to Defendants’ counsel of the amended forms is not included.

At or before the hearing, Counsel must identify who the parties in the attached proofs of service are. Counsel is also ordered to submit a proof of service indicating the amended forms were served upon Defendants’ counsel.

On October 29, 2019, Rob Saslow, CLPF, NCG, administrator of the estate of Plaintiff filed a motion to substitute into the action. According to the attached declaration of his counsel Jeffrey A. Coleman, Plaintiff passed away on February 26, 2019. She died intestate. All of her relatives within the third degree pre-deceased her. (Coleman Decl. ¶ 2.) Saslow filed a petition for probate on behalf of Plaintiff’s Estate. Three distant relatives of Plaintiff nominated Saslow as administrator of the Estate. On October 25, 2019, the Probate Court granted Plaintiff’s Estate’s for probate and granted Saslow full powers under the Independent Administration of Estates Act, with limited authority. Plaintiff’s Estate’s motion to substitute into the action is currently set for hearing on April 7, 2020 – after the trial date. The parties should be prepared to discuss advancing the motion to substitute into the action to November 7, 2019 or November 13, 2019.