This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/19/2023 at 07:18:27 (UTC).

CHERYL BOWENS VS WHOLE FOODS MARKET CALIFORNIA, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 06/02/2022 CHERYL BOWENS filed a Property - Other Property lawsuit against WHOLE FOODS MARKET CALIFORNIA, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8145

  • Filing Date:

    06/02/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BOWENS CHERYL

Defendants

DOES 1 THROUGH 100 INCLUSIVE

MRS. GOOCHS NATURAL FOOD MARKETS INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

WHOLE FOODS MARKET CALIFORNIA INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BOOKER ROBERT L II

Defendant Attorney

BENNETT MATTHEW E.

 

Court Documents

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

6/2/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

6/2/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Unknown - SEVENTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR PROCEDURES IN THE PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURTS

6/2/2022: Unknown - SEVENTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR PROCEDURES IN THE PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURTS

Unknown - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL PERSONAL INJURY CASE

6/2/2022: Unknown - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL PERSONAL INJURY CASE

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

6/2/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/2/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

6/2/2022: Complaint

Proof of Personal Service

8/3/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

8/3/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Answer

8/29/2022: Answer

Proof of Service by Mail

8/29/2022: Proof of Service by Mail

Notice of Change of Handling Attorney

2/14/2023: Notice of Change of Handling Attorney

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/30/2024
  • Hearing05/30/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2023
  • Hearing11/30/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2023
  • Hearing11/16/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • DocketNotice of Change of Handling Attorney; Filed by: Cheryl Bowens (Plaintiff); As to: WHOLE FOODS MARKET CALIFORNIA, INC., a California corporation (Defendant); MRS. GOOCHS NATURAL FOOD MARKETS, INC. a California corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: MRS. GOOCHS NATURAL FOOD MARKETS, INC. a California corporation (Defendant); As to: Cheryl Bowens (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by: WHOLE FOODS MARKET CALIFORNIA, INC., a California corporation (Defendant); MRS. GOOCHS NATURAL FOOD MARKETS, INC. a California corporation (Defendant); As to: Cheryl Bowens (Plaintiff); After Substituted Service of Summons and Complaint ?: Yes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Cheryl Bowens (Plaintiff); As to: WHOLE FOODS MARKET CALIFORNIA, INC., a California corporation (Defendant); Service Date: 07/28/2022; Service Cost: 125.64; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Cheryl Bowens (Plaintiff); As to: MRS. GOOCHS NATURAL FOOD MARKETS, INC. a California corporation (Defendant); Service Date: 07/28/2022; Service Cost: 89.35; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 05/30/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 29

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Serena R. Murillo in Department 29 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 11/16/2023 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 29

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 11/30/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 29

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Cheryl Bowens (Plaintiff); As to: WHOLE FOODS MARKET CALIFORNIA, INC., a California corporation (Defendant); MRS. GOOCHS NATURAL FOOD MARKETS, INC. a California corporation (Defendant); DOES 1 through 100, inclusive (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Cheryl Bowens (Plaintiff); As to: WHOLE FOODS MARKET CALIFORNIA, INC., a California corporation (Defendant); MRS. GOOCHS NATURAL FOOD MARKETS, INC. a California corporation (Defendant); DOES 1 through 100, inclusive (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Cheryl Bowens (Plaintiff); As to: WHOLE FOODS MARKET CALIFORNIA, INC., a California corporation (Defendant); MRS. GOOCHS NATURAL FOOD MARKETS, INC. a California corporation (Defendant); DOES 1 through 100, inclusive (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • DocketSeventh Amended Standing Order for Procedures in the Personal Injury Hub Courts; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Personal Injury Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less