This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/24/2021 at 03:44:40 (UTC).

CHEROKEE HARRIS, ET AL. VS JORDAN KAI, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 01/15/2021 CHEROKEE HARRIS filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against JORDAN KAI. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1687

  • Filing Date:

    01/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

HARRIS CHEROKEE

FUSELIAR RONNIE

Defendants

KAI JORDAN

CHAPMAN JASON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

LUCERO LINDA

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

2/8/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

PI General Order

2/8/2021: PI General Order

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

1/15/2021: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/15/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

1/15/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

1/15/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

1/15/2021: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Complaint

1/15/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/12/2024
  • Hearing01/12/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • Hearing07/15/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • Hearing07/01/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Date); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Cherokee Harris (Plaintiff); Ronnie Fuseliar (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Cherokee Harris (Plaintiff); Ronnie Fuseliar (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Cherokee Harris (Plaintiff); Ronnie Fuseliar (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer LUCERO LINDA